Reports for SFC Conseils Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SFC Conseils Sàrl
- SFC Conseils Sàrl has its legal headquarters in La Rippe and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Sport services».
- The company was founded on 01.02.2017.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 12.02.2024.
- SFC Conseils Sàrl is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-209.306.854.
- On the same address as SFC Conseils Sàrl there are 3 other active companies registered. These include: BERCO Sàrl, BST SA, Cober FV Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.02.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
La Rippe
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.171.995-1
UID/VAT
CHE-209.306.854
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but: l'organisation de manifestations et/ou d'évènements sportif, commercial et de marketing; le recouvrement de créances pour le compte de tiers, ainsi que toutes activités s'y rapportant; la fourniture de toute assistance administrative; le courtage immobilier, commercial, de véhicules et d'assurances et conseils; la prestation de services divers dans tous les domaines; la création, la fabrication et la commercialisation de vêtements sur-mesure et accessoires (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SFC Conseils Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005959017, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
SFC Conseils Sàrl, à La Rippe, CHE-209.306.854 (FOSC du 07.06.2021, p. 0/1005209302). Cortaz Frédéric, qui n'est plus associé et est nommé président, cède ses 20 parts de CHF 1'000 à Cober FV Sàrl (CHE-296.069.057), à La Rippe, nouvelle associée, titulaire de 20 parts de CHF 1'000.
Nouvelle gérante:
Bersier Valérie, de Cugy (FR), à La Rippe, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005209302, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
SFC Conseils Sàrl, à La Rippe, CHE-209.306.854 (FOSC du 06.02.2017, p. 0/3329413). Bersier Valérie, qui n'est plus associée-gérante et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 20 parts de CHF 1'000 à Cortaz Frédéric, de Meyrin, à La Rippe, nouvel associé-gérant avec signature individuelle, titulaire de 20 parts de CHF 1'000.
Publication number: 3329413, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
SFC Conseils Sàrl, à La Rippe, chemin de la Douane 1, 1278 La Rippe, CHE-209.306.854. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
27 janvier 2017.
But:
la société a pour but: l'organisation de manifestations et/ou d'évènements sportif, commercial et de marketing;
le recouvrement de créances pour le compte de tiers, ainsi que toutes activités s'y rapportant;
la fourniture de toute assistance administrative;
le courtage immobilier, commercial, de véhicules et d'assurances et conseils;
la prestation de services divers dans tous les domaines;
la création, la fabrication et la commercialisation de vêtements sur-mesure et accessoires (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Capital social:
CHF 20'000.
Associée-gérante avec signature individuelle:
Bersier Valérie, de Cugy (FR), à La Rippe, avec 20 parts de CHF 1'000.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courrier électronique. Selon déclaration du 27 janvier 2017, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.