Address
c/o Gianni Hauert
Chemin des Minoux 21
2900 Porrentruy
Reports for Serge Hauert et fils S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Serge Hauert et fils S.A.
- Serge Hauert et fils S.A. is active in the industry «Fund management» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Porrentruy.
- The management consists of 3 persons. The company was founded on 03.01.1980.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 15.12.2022, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.924.048.
Management (3)
newest board members
Michel Hubert Edouard Hauert,
Pierre Charles Serge Hauert,
Gianni Hauert
newest authorized signatories
Michel Hubert Edouard Hauert,
Pierre Charles Serge Hauert,
Gianni Hauert
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.01.1980
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Porrentruy
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-677.3.000.455-6
UID/VAT
CHE-101.924.048
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gestion de patrimoine de toute nature (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Simon Kohler S.A. | Courgenay | 29.05.1997 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Serge Hauert et fils SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Serge Hauert et fils S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005629908, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Serge Hauert et fils S.A., à Porrentruy, CHE-101.924.048, société anonyme (No. FOSC 125 du 02.07.2019, Publ. 1004665737).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Gianni Hauert, Chemin des Minoux 21, 2900 Porrentruy.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Hauert, Serge, de Wengi, à Porrentruy, membre du conseil, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Hauert, Pierre Charles Serge, de Wengi, à Orbe, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Hauert, Michel Hubert Edouard, de Wengi, à Tramelan, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Hauert, Gianni, de Wengi, à Porrentruy, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004665737, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Serge Hauert et fils S.A., à Fahy, CHE-101.924.048, société anonyme (No. FOSC 187 du 27.09.2006, p.7, Publ. 3567610).
Modification des statuts:
21.06.2019.
Nouveau siège:
Porrentruy.
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Serge Hauert, Route de Bressaucourt 22, 2900 Porrentruy.
Nouveau but:
Gestion de patrimoine de toute nature (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Nouveaux faits qualifiés:
Abrogation, selon l'article 628 al. 4 CO, des dispositions statutaires relatives à la reprise de biens [précédemment: A. et P. de la raison individuelle "D. Rossé", à Fahy, pour le prix de CHF 73'000.--, selon bilan au 01.06.1980.].
Nouvelles communications:
Communications aux actionnaires: par lettre recommandée ou par courriel.
Nouvelle restriction à la transmissibilité:
Restriction à la transmissibilité des actions nominatives: selon statuts. [biffé: Restriction de transmissibilité des actions selon statuts.].
Publication number: 3567610, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Serge Hauert et fils S.A., à Fahy, CH-677.3.000.455-6, Terminage et diamantage de boîtes de formes, ainsi que tous travaux similaires. Société anonyme (FOSC no 120 du 25.06.2002, p. 7, publ. 527038).
Personnes et signatures radiées:
Hauert, Pierre, de Wengi, à Porrentruy, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux avec le vice-président;
Hauert, Michel, de Wengi, à Miécourt, vice-président, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne:
Hauert, Serge, de Wengi, à Porrentruy, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.