Address
Route de Chailly 209
1814 La Tour-de-Peilz
Reports for Select-Immob SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Select-Immob SA
- Select-Immob SA from La Tour-de-Peilz operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is active.
- The management has 2 active persons registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 28.09.2023.
- The company Select-Immob SA is registered under the UID CHE-103.085.476.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: GS Holding SA, Solaso Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.11.1932
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
La Tour-de-Peilz
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.125.800-3
UID/VAT
CHE-103.085.476
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gestion, administration, gérance, courtage, analyse, expertise, assistance, représentation, conseil, exploitation, fourniture de tout service et prestation dans tout domaine commercial, notamment immobilier et de la construction, des assurances, de la publicité et des voyages.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Office de contrôle et d'expertise SA | La Tour-de-Peilz | 23.11.2004 | 10.03.2009 | |
Fiduconsult Lausanne SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 22.11.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Select-Immob S.A.
- CGS Général Services SA
- CGS Général Services S.A.
- SI Seulette SA.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Select-Immob SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005848065, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Select-Immob SA, à La Tour-de-Peilz, CHE-103.085.476 (FOSC du 31.10.2022, p. 0/1005594298). Stam George est nommé président. Stam Alexandra, de et à Savigny, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005594298, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Select-Immob SA, à La Tour-de-Peilz, CHE-103.085.476 (FOSC du 28.10.2021, p. 0/1005322323). Savioz Christian n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Stam George, qui n'est plus président, est maintenant à Riddes.
Publication number: HR02-1005322323, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Select-Immob SA, à La Tour-de-Peilz, CHE-103.085.476 (FOSC du 01.06.2021, p. 0/1005201146). Stam George, qui est maintenant à La Tour-de-Peilz et n'est plus secrétaire, est nommé président. Savioz Christian, qui n'est plus président, est nommé secrétaire.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.