Address
c/o Gemeinde Disentis/Mustér
Via Cons 2
7180 Disentis/Mustér
Reports for Sedrun Disentis Tourismus SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sedrun Disentis Tourismus SA
- Sedrun Disentis Tourismus SA is active in the industry «Other booking services» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Disentis/Mustér.
- The management of the company Sedrun Disentis Tourismus SA consists of 8 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 04.02.2020.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 26.06.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-340.050.810.
Management (8)
newest board members
Annette Meyer,
Desiree Willimann,
Silvio Schmid,
Josef Columberg,
René Epp
newest authorized signatories
Annette Meyer,
Nicole Weber,
Desiree Willimann,
Pascal Schär,
Silvio Schmid
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.02.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Disentis/Mustér
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.013.255-9
UID/VAT
CHE-340.050.810
Sector
Other booking services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Vermarktung der Destination Sedrun Disentis als Kerngeschäft, die Bündelung und Vernetzung der Kräfte zur Verbesserung des touristischen Angebots sowie der Gästeinformation der Destination. Sie darf ferner alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, den Gesellschaftszweck zu fördern. Sie kann zur Erfüllung ihrer Aufgaben mit Dritten zusammenarbeiten, eigene Tochterunternehmungen, Niederlassungen oder Tochterunternehmungen gemeinsam mit Dritten gründen. Insbesondere kann sie Kooperationen mit benachbarten Tourismusorganisationen zur Destinationsentwicklung und deren Ausbau eingehen. Sie hat dabei dem Wohlbefinden der Gäste vor Ort besondere Beachtung zu schenken. Diesem Anliegen dienen ausgeglichene Angebote im Sommer wie im Winter. Zum anderen sollen die Gäste vor Ort kompetent informiert und beraten werden. Die nähere Umschreibung der mit dem Gesellschaftszweck verbundenen Aufgaben erfolgt in den Leistungsaufträgen der Gemeinden.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ADDISSA AG | Ilanz/Glion | 06.05.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Durschei Fiduziaria SA | Disentis/Mustér | 07.02.2020 | 05.05.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sedrun Disentis Tourismus SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006067792, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Sedrun Disentis Tourismus SA, in Disentis/Mustér, CHE-340.050.810, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 86 vom 03.05.2024, Publ. 1006024724).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gygli, Daniel, von Eriswil, in Hünenberg, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meyer, Annette, von Villmergen, in Tujetsch, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Weber, Nicole, von Glarus Nord, in Luzern, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006024724, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Sedrun Disentis Tourismus SA, in Disentis/Mustér, CHE-340.050.810, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 205 vom 21.10.2022, Publ. 1005588475).
Statutenänderung:
15.04.2024.
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 100'000.00 [bisher: CHF 50'000.00].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Decurtins, Renato, von Trun, in Tujetsch, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Willimann, Desiree, von Beromünster, in Tujetsch, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schär, Pascal, von Uster, in Uster, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005588475, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Sedrun Disentis Tourismus SA, in Disentis/Mustér, CHE-340.050.810, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 06.05.2022, Publ. 1005467607).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Barmettler, Simona, von Ennetmoos, in Tujetsch, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schär, Pascal, von Uster, in Uster, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.