Reports for SDR Dental AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SDR Dental AG
- SDR Dental AG with its legal headquarters in Meggen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of other financial institutions». SDR Dental AG is active.
- The company was founded on 27.05.2022 and has one person in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 15.03.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company SDR Dental AG is the following: CHE-208.768.353.
- There are 5 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: consulteer ag, consulteer Holding AG, consulteer InCyber AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.05.2022
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Meggen
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.814.368-9
UID/VAT
CHE-208.768.353
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb oder das Halten, die Verwaltung und die Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Dentalunternehmen oder anderen Unternehmen. Erwerb, Verwertung und Verkauf von Urheberrechten, Patenten, Lizenzen, Marken und anderen Immaterialgüterrechten. Ferner kann sie im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Die Gesellschaft kann überdies alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft in Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SDR Dental AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005700748, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SDR Dental AG, in Meggen, CHE-208.768.353, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 105 vom 01.06.2022, Publ. 1005485914).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Riedweg, Maurus, von Schwarzenberg, in Meggen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR01-1005485914, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
SDR Dental AG, in Meggen, CHE-208.768.353, Riedweg 6, 6045 Meggen, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
23.05.2022.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb oder das Halten, die Verwaltung und die Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Dentalunternehmen oder anderen Unternehmen. Erwerb, Verwertung und Verkauf von Urheberrechten, Patenten, Lizenzen, Marken und anderen Immaterialgüterrechten. Ferner kann sie im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Die Gesellschaft kann überdies alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die direkt oder indirekt mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft in Zusammenhang stehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen durch Brief oder E-Mail.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Mit Erklärung vom 23.05.2022 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Riedweg, Sara, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Riedweg, Maurus, von Schwarzenberg, in Meggen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.