Reports for Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG (SViAG)
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG (SViAG)
- Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG (SViAG) is active in the industry «Trading in agricultural products and livestock» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Rothenthurm.
- The company was founded on 07.06.1994.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 05.06.2019. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG (SViAG) is registered in the Canton of SZ under the UID CHE-102.231.806.
Management (5)
newest board members
Gilg Reichmuth,
Stefan Meyer,
Pius Schuler,
Edwin Schalch,
Josef Schönbächler
newest authorized signatories
Gilg Reichmuth,
Stefan Meyer,
Pius Schuler,
Edwin Schalch,
Josef Schönbächler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.06.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rothenthurm
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.007.035-6
UID/VAT
CHE-102.231.806
Sector
Trading in agricultural products and livestock
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Organisation und Durchführung von Nutz- und Schlachtviehmärkten aller Art; kann sich auch selber am Handel beteiligen, sofern das im Interesse der Bauern in ihrem Einzugsgebiet erfolgt; kann dazu ein oder mehrere Vermarktungszentren betreiben, welche auch für den Handel von anderen Landwirtschaftsprodukten, sowie für landwirtschaftliche Ausstellungen zur Verfügung stehen. Diese Zentren können auch für nichtlandwirtschaftliche Veranstaltungen aller Art zur Verfügung gestellt werden; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, sowie Grundstücke erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CONVISA Revisions AG | Schwyz | 05.06.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Christen Treuhand | Altdorf (UR) | 11.06.2008 | 04.06.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG SViAG
- Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG (SViAG)
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004644629, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG (SViAG), in Rothenthurm, CHE-102.231.806, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 11.06.2008, S.14, Publ. 4517612).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Christen Treuhand (CH-120.1.000.587-0), in Altdorf UR, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Convisa Revisions AG (CHE-113.961.292), in Schwyz, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4517612, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG (SViAG), in Rothenthurm, CH-130.0.007.035-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 05.07.2006, S. 18, Publ. 3448082).
Gestrichene Personen und Unterschriften:
Eberhard, Anton, von Schwyz, in Merlischachen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Agro Treuhand Uri, Nid- und Obwalden GmbH, in Altdorf UR, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reichmuth, Gilg, von Schwyz, in Schwyz, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied];
Meyer, Stefan, von Küssnacht SZ, in Küssnacht SZ, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Christen Treuhand (CH-120.1.000.587-0), in Altdorf UR, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 3448082, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Schwyzer Viehvermarktungs AG (SViAG), bisher in Ingenbohl, CH-130.0.007.035-6, Durchführung von Nutz- und Schlachtviehmärkten, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 10.09.2003, S. 11, Publ. 1165218).
Statutenänderung:
25.04.2006.
Sitz neu:
Rothenthurm.
Domizil neu:
Landstrasse 35, 6418 Rothenthurm.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Betschart, Franz, von Muotathal, in Rickenbach bei Schwyz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reichmuth, Gilg, von Schwyz, in Schwyz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.