Address
c/o Martin Sauter
Molliserstrasse 24
8754 Netstal
Reports for Schwert AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schwert AG
- Schwert AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses». The legal headquarters are in Netstal.
- The company was founded on 18.05.1948.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 08.07.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register GL under the UID CHE-105.857.333.
Management (3)
newest board members
Martin Heinrich Sauter,
Martin Reithebuch,
Dr. iur. Matthias Friedrich Auer
newest authorized signatories
Martin Heinrich Sauter,
Martin Reithebuch,
Dr. iur. Matthias Friedrich Auer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.05.1948
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.3.003.228-3
UID/VAT
CHE-105.857.333
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung des Hotel- und Restaurationsbetriebes "Schwert" in Netstal; An- und Verkauf sowie Bau, Vermietung und Verwaltung von Liegenschaften; die Gesellschaft kann alle mit ihrem Zweck zusammenhängenden Geschäfte vornehmen, Grundeigentum erwerben, sich bei gleichartigen oder verwandten Unternehmen beteiligen sowie solche erwerben oder errichten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
UMBERG TREUHAND AG | Glarus | 12.07.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schwert AG Netstal
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schwert AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005516294, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Schwert AG, in Glarus, CHE-105.857.333, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 12.07.2012, S.0, Publ. 6765146).
Domizil neu:
c/o Martin Sauter, Molliserstrasse 24, 8754 Netstal.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sauter, Martin Heinrich, von Stein am Rhein, in Netstal (Glarus), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Auer, Dr. Matthias Friedrich, von Glarus, in Netstal (Glarus), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Auer, Dr. Matthias, von Glarus und Oberhallau, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
UMBERG TREUHAND AG (CHE-106.897.051), in Glarus, Revisionsstelle [bisher: UMBERG TREUHAND AG].
Publication number: 6765146, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Schwert AG, in Glarus, CH-160.3.003.228-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 71 vom 11.04.2011, S. 0, Publ. 6116654).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spörri, Hansjörg, von Affoltern am Albis, in Netstal, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
UMBERG TREUHAND AG (CH-160.3.003.084-6), in Glarus, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6116654, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Schwert AG, in Netstal, CH-160.3.003.228-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 158 vom 18.08.2009, S. 11, Publ. 5201268).
Sitz neu:
Glarus. Infolge Fusion per 01.01.2011 der bisherigen Gemeinden Netstal, Glarus, Riedern und Ennenda zur Einheitsgemeinde Glarus, musste als neuer Sitz die neue politische Gemeinde Glarus von Amtes wegen im Handelsregister eingetragen werden.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Auer, Dr. Matthias, von Glarus und Oberhallau, in Netstal (Glarus), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher:von Netstal, in Netstal];
Reithebuch, Martin, von Glarus Nord, in Sool (Glarus Süd), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher:von Bilten, in Sool];
Sauter, Martin, von Stein am Rhein, in Netstal (Glarus), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher:in Netstal].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.