Address
c/o Dr. Albert Dormann
Bohlstrasse 7
6300 Zug
Reports for Schweizer Seelsorge-Stiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schweizer Seelsorge-Stiftung
- Schweizer Seelsorge-Stiftung is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Zug. Schweizer Seelsorge-Stiftung belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- The management of the organization Schweizer Seelsorge-Stiftung consists of 7 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 19.06.2023.
- The reported UID is CHE-110.209.683.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Infoteam Sales Process Consulting AG, ONEGroup Company AG.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Martin Scheibli,
Markus Parigger,
Jean-Marie Duvoisin,
Dr. Xaver Baumberger,
Cornelia Wigger
newest authorized signatories
Martin Scheibli,
Markus Parigger,
Jean-Marie Duvoisin,
Dr. Xaver Baumberger,
Cornelia Wigger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.06.1998
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.7.000.540-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.209.683
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung fördert ideell und materiell die religiöse, insbesondere seelsorgerliche Betreuung und das sakramentale Leben aller Gläubigen, die der unverkürzten Lehre der katholischen Kirche verpflichtet sind. Zu diesem Zwecke arbeitet die Stiftung eng mit Priestern zusammen, die sich zum Depositum fidei bekennen, so wie es uns Jesus Christus in Seiner Einen, Heiligen, Katholischen und Apostolischen Kirche hinterlassen hat und wie es in der Einheit mit dem Nachfolger des heiligen Petrus, dem Papst, bewahrt wird; kann alle Bestrebungen unterstützen, die der Verbreitung und Vertiefung des katholischen Glaubens dienen, unterstützen, sowohl in der Schweiz als auch im Bereich der katholischen Weltkirche; kann Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten, belasten und verkaufen. Die Stiftung erfüllt ihre Aufgaben unter Berücksichtigung des hierarchischen und universellen Charakters der Weltkirche.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG | Kriens | 02.11.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhandbüro Jürgen Apitz | Gebenstorf | 29.10.2007 | 01.11.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schweizer Seelsorge-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005771682, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Schweizer Seelsorge-Stiftung, in Zug, CHE-110.209.683, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 02.06.2022, Publ. 1005486809).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walser, Dr. Markus, von Zürich, in Vaduz (LI), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheibli, Martin, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Wetzikon (ZH)].
Publication number: HR02-1005486809, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Schweizer Seelsorge-Stiftung, in Zug, CHE-110.209.683, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 231 vom 28.11.2018, Publ. 1004507696).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheibli, Martin, von Zürich, in Wetzikon (ZH), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004507696, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Schweizer Seelsorge-Stiftung, in Zug, CHE-110.209.683, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2017, Publ. 3275881).
Weitere Adressen:
Hermannweg 4, 8400 Winterthur.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Camenzind, Erich, von Gersau, in Rothenthurm, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Langenauer-Erni, Sibylle, von Emmen, Entlebuch und Urnäsch, in Rothenburg, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Parigger, Markus, von Glarus, in Gossau (ZH), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Duvoisin, Jean-Marie, von Tévenon, in Einsiedeln, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.