Reports for Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald Genossenschaft
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald Genossenschaft
- Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald Genossenschaft with its legal headquarters in Braunwald is a Cooperative from the sector «Other services in education». Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald Genossenschaft is active.
- The management consists of 5 persons. The organization was founded on 31.12.1997.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 07.12.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of GL is CHE-100.725.003.
Management (5)
newest members of the administration
Thomas Marc Schnyder,
Roland Ivo Rinderer,
Silvia Blatter,
Kerona Baumgartner-Glarner,
Reto Glarner
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Marc Schnyder,
Roland Ivo Rinderer,
Silvia Blatter,
Kerona Baumgartner-Glarner,
Reto Glarner
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.12.1997
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Süd
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.5.003.435-9
UID/VAT
CHE-100.725.003
Sector
Other services in education
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Genossenschaft bezweckt, die Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald nach bewährten Grundsätzen und in Übereinstimmung mit den gesetzlichen Bestimmungen zu führen, mit den am Tourismus im allgemeinen und am Schneesport im besonderen interessierten Institutionen zusammenzuarbeiten und die Belange ihrer Mitglieder zu fördern. Sie ist Mitglied von Swiss Snowsports und anerkennt dessen Statuten als für sich verbindlich.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald
- Genossenschaft Schweizer Skischule und Schweizer Snowboardschule Braunwald
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald Genossenschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005903754, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald Genossenschaft, in Glarus Süd, CHE-100.725.003, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 18.02.2020, Publ. 1004832727).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schuler, Balthasar, von Glarus Süd, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schnyder, Thomas Marc, von Vorderthal, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004832727, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald Genossenschaft, in Glarus Süd, CHE-100.725.003, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 01.12.2015, S.0, Publ. 2511881).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schweizer, Roland, von Glarus Süd, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rinderer, Roland Ivo, von Glarus Süd, in Ennenda (Glarus), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Blatter, Silvia, von Wattwil, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Mitglied, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Aktuarin, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Baumgartner-Glarner, Kerona, von Glarus Süd, in Glarus, Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2511881, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Schweizer Schneesportschule Braunwald Genossenschaft, in Glarus Süd, CHE-100.725.003, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 204 vom 19.10.2012, Publ. 6896550).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Glarner, Josef, von Glarus Süd, in Mollis (Glarus Nord), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Kessler, Hansjürg, von Glarus Süd und Waldstatt, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Baumann, Maya, von Basel und Waldenburg, in Netstal (Glarus), Mitglied und Aktuarin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zweifel Ortlieb, Ursula, von Glarus Süd, in Schwanden GL (Glarus Süd), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Herger, Ernst, von Glarus Süd und Spiringen, in Tägerwilen, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schweizer, Roland, von Glarus Süd, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Glarner, Reto, von Glarus Süd, in Luchsingen (Glarus Süd), Vizepräsident und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung mit Einzelunterschrift];
Blatter, Silvia, von Wattwil, in Braunwald (Glarus Süd), Aktuarin und Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Wattwil, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.