Head office
Other branches (1)
Reports for Schweizer Salinen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schweizer Salinen AG
- Schweizer Salinen AG with its legal headquarters in Rheinfelden is a Branch with head office in Switzerland from the sector «Other mining». Schweizer Salinen AG is active.
- The management has 0 active persons registered.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 21.03.2014. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company Schweizer Salinen AG is registered under the UID CHE-305.162.539.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1909
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Rheinfelden
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.9.001.176-2
UID/VAT
CHE-305.162.539
CHE-105.957.650 VAT
Sector
Other mining
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Salz, Salzgemische u. Sole; Produktion, Einfuhr, Verkauf usw
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Salines Suisses SA
- Schweizer Rheinsalinen AG
- Vereinigte Schweizerische Rheinsalinen
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schweizer Salinen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1409831, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Schweizer Rheinsalinen AG, in Rheinfelden, CHE-305.162.539, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 30.06.2010, S. 2, Publ. 5701084).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Pratteln.
Firma neu:
Schweizer Salinen AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Salines Suisses SA).
Firma Hauptsitz neu:
Schweizer Salinen AG (Salines Suisses SA) [bisher: Firma Hauptsitz: Schweizer Rheinsalinen AG (Salines Suisses du Rhin SA)].
Publication number: 5701084, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Vereinigte Schweizerische Rheinsalinen, in Rheinfelden, CH-400.9.001.176-2, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 15.01.2008, S. 2, Publ. 4288916).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Pratteln.
Firma neu:
Schweizer Rheinsalinen AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Salines Suisses du Rhin SA).
Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CH-280.3.910.245-6.
Firma Hauptsitz neu:
Schweizer Rheinsalinen AG (Salines Suisses du Rhin SA) [bisher: Firma: Vereinigte Schweizerische Rheinsalinen (Société des Salines Suisses du Rhin réunies)].
Registrierung Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichenes Eintragsdatum am Hauptsitz aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV] [bisher: Eintragsdatum: 22.7.1909].
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Zweckangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Gestrichene Personenangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Altermatt, Bruno, von Nunningen, in Nunningen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Roos, Dr. Armin, von Luzern, in Arisdorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Lieberherr, Dr. Jürg, von Nesslau und Küsnacht ZH, in Zumikon, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Habich, Carl A., von Rheinfelden, in Rheinfelden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Neubert, Wolfgang, von Winterthur, in Niedergösgen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Eggenberger, Ernst, von Grabs, in Rheinfelden, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Wanner, Christian, von Messen, in Messen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rebmann, Dieter, von Kaisten, in Nunningen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schönenberger, Peter, von Kirchberg SG, in Mörschwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gasche, Urs, von Derendingen und Oekingen, in Fraubrunnen, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Trachsel, Stefan, von Wattenwil, in Diegten, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Berger Pössnecker, Cornelia, von Olten und Langnau im Emmental, in Winznau, Leiterin, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 4288916, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Vereinigte Schweizerische Rheinsalinen, in Rheinfelden, CH-400.9.001.176-2, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 245 vom 18.12.2006, S. 3, Publ. 3685978).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Pratteln.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wehrli, Karl, von Küttigen, in Hornussen, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Berger Pössnecker, Cornelia, von Olten und Langnau im Emmental, in Winznau, Leiterin, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.