Reports for Schwab Gartenbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schwab Gartenbau AG
- Schwab Gartenbau AG is currently active and the industry «Gardening and landscaping». The legal headquarters are in Ipsach.
- The company was founded on 19.05.1992 and has 3 persons in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 27.04.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-107.403.517.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.05.1992
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ipsach
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.3.004.634-5
UID/VAT
CHE-107.403.517
Sector
Gardening and landscaping
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Planung, die Neuanlage, die Pflege und den Unterhalt von Gartenanlagen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, gleichartige und verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten, Grundstücke erwerben, verkaufen und belasten sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, welche geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KMU-Treuhand & Revisionen Seeland AG | Ins | 27.04.2023 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wyssbrod + Partner Treuhand AG | Ipsach | 18.12.2009 | 26.04.2023 | |
Lässer Treuhand AG | Biel/Bienne | 14.07.2004 | 13.05.2009 | |
Inima Finanzberatungen und Treuhand AG | Aarberg | <2004 | 13.07.2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schwab Gartenbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005733303, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Schwab Gartenbau AG, in Ipsach, CHE-107.403.517, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 226 vom 19.11.2020, Publ. 1005026434).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wyssbrod + Partner Treuhand AG (CHE-109.451.734), in Ipsach, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schwab, Marc, von Kallnach, in Ipsach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Kuhn, Bettina, von Kallnach, in Tschugg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
KMU-Treuhand & Revisionen Seeland AG (CHE-101.115.221), in Ins, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005026434, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Schwab Gartenbau AG, in Ipsach, CHE-107.403.517, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 244 vom 17.12.2019, Publ. 1004785019).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kuhn, Bettina, von Kallnach, in Tschugg, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Schwab, Bettina, in Vinelz].
Publication number: HR02-1004785019, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Schwab Gartenbau AG, in Ipsach, CHE-107.403.517, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 28.05.2018, Publ. 4251431).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schwab, Margaretha, von Kallnach, in Walperswil, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Schwab, Rudolf, von Kallnach, in Walperswil, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schwab, Bettina, von Kallnach, in Vinelz, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Sutz (Sutz-Lattrigen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Schwab, Marc, von Kallnach, in Ipsach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Schwab, Yves, von Kallnach, in Ipsach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.