Reports for Schneto AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schneto AG
- Schneto AG with its legal headquarters in Bennwil is active. Schneto AG operates in the sector «Locksmithery, smithy and workshops».
- The company was founded on 24.09.1946 and has 3 persons in its management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 28.12.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-102.357.933.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.09.1946
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bennwil
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.910.458-8
UID/VAT
CHE-102.357.933
Sector
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation von und Handel mit Präzisions-Drehteilen. Die Gesellschaft kann Waren importieren und exportieren, Grundeigentum erwerben sowie sich an Gesellschaften aktiv oder still beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TRETOR AG | Liestal | 14.09.2007 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 28.10.2005 | 13.09.2007 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 | 27.10.2005 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Schneto SA
- Schneto Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schneto AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005921859, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Schneto AG, in Bennwil, CHE-102.357.933, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2019, Publ. 1004621738).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weiland, Franziska, von Dornach, in Hochwald, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Heidi Julia, von Langenbruck, in Oberdorf (BL), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004621738, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Schneto AG, in Bennwil, CHE-102.357.933, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 238 vom 07.12.2018, Publ. 1004515257).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumann, Rudolf, von Olten und Starrkirch-Wil, in Triengen, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baumann, Michael, von Starrkirch-Wil und Olten, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004515257, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Schneto AG, in Bennwil, CHE-102.357.933, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 19.07.2012, Publ. 6776096).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baumann, Michael, von Olten und Starrkirch-Wil, in Zürich, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Olten und Starrkirch-Wil, in Luzern, Delegierter, mit Einzelunterschrift];
TRETOR AG (CHE-108.227.200), in Liestal, Revisionsstelle [bisher: TRETOR AG (CH-280.3.900.042-2)];
Liberatore, Fabrizio, von Frenkendorf, in Frenkendorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Weiland, Franziska, von Dornach, in Hochwald, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.