Reports for Schlössli Sax AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schlössli Sax AG
- Schlössli Sax AG with its legal headquarters in Sax is active. Schlössli Sax AG operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The company was founded on 03.03.1978.
- The last commercial register change was made on 30.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Schlössli Sax AG is the following: CHE-100.680.636.
Management (8)
newest board members
Janina Robbi,
Samuel Saxer,
Christoph Tinner,
Dr. Küngolt Bietenhard Rohner,
Andreas Schwarz
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Küngolt Bietenhard Rohner,
Andreas Schwarz,
Marco Stucki
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.03.1978
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sennwald
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.017.318-8
UID/VAT
CHE-100.680.636
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb und Erhaltung des 'Schlössli Sax'; insbesondere soll das 'Schlössli Sax' in seiner baulichen Gestalt als historisches Wahrzeichen der Region erhalten und unterhalten werden; hierfür werden die Einnahmen eingesetzt. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, pachten oder vermieten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Montfort Audit & Advisory AG | Buchs (SG) | 09.09.2021 |
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Innovatis Treuhand AG | Buchs (SG) | 20.05.2016 | 11.08.2021 | |
ACT Audit & Tax AG | Zug | 07.11.2012 | 19.05.2016 | |
bbz treuhand gmbh | Sevelen | 25.09.2006 | 06.11.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schlössli Sax AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006118436, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Schlössli Sax AG, in Sennwald, CHE-100.680.636, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 26.06.2024, Publ. 1006067758).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zeiske, Carsten, von Marbach SG, in Diepoldsau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Robbi, Janina, von Kerns, in Buchs SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Saxer, Samuel, von Sevelen, in Buchs SG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1006067758, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Schlössli Sax AG, in Sennwald, CHE-100.680.636, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 2 vom 04.01.2023, Publ. 1005643896).
Statutenänderung:
14.06.2024.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 1'278'400.00 [bisher: CHF 1'151'600.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 1'278'400.00 [bisher: CHF 1'151'600.00].
Aktien neu:
3'196 Namenaktien zu CHF 400.00 [bisher: 2'879 Namenaktien zu CHF 400.00]. Kapitalerhöhung aus genehmigtem Aktienkapital.
Publication number: HR02-1005643896, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Schlössli Sax AG, in Sennwald, CHE-100.680.636, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 09.09.2021, Publ. 1005287945).
Statutenänderung:
17.06.2022.
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: c/o Beat Tinner, Langacker 35, 9478 Azmoos].
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 1'151'600.00 [bisher: CHF 2'879'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 1'151'600.00 [bisher: CHF 2'879'000.00].
Aktien neu:
2'879 Namenaktien zu CHF 400.00 [bisher: 2'879 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00]. Bei der Kapitalherabsetzung vom 17.06.2022 wird der Nennwert der 2'879 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 zur Beseitigung einer Unterbilanz auf CHF 400.00 herabgesetzt. Die Gesellschaft hat mit Beschluss vom 17.06.2022 eine genehmigte Kapitalerhöhung gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten eingeführt.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bereuter, Jürg, von Zürich, in Rorschach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tinner, Christoph, von Sennwald, in Sax (Sennwald), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.