Reports for Schaltag AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Schaltag AG
- Schaltag AG in Effretikon is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances». Schaltag AG is active.
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 09.07.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Schaltag AG is the following: CHE-101.230.388.
Management (4)
newest board members
Dominik Felix Hanslin,
Lukas Erich Gayler,
Dr. Michael Manfred Buscher
newest authorized signatories
Endi Ajradini,
Dominik Felix Hanslin,
Lukas Erich Gayler,
Dr. Michael Manfred Buscher
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.07.1961
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Illnau-Effretikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.922.943-8
UID/VAT
CHE-101.230.388
Sector
Manufacturing of other electrical equipment/appliances
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation von und Handel mit elektrischen und elektronischen Steuerungs- und Schaltanlagen; kann Vertretungen übernehmen und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 08.01.2021 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Zürich | 18.02.2016 | 07.01.2021 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 | 17.02.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Schaltag AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006079142, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schaltag AG, in Illnau-Effretikon, CHE-101.230.388, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 21.06.2024, Publ. 1006063215).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Sandra, von Berneck, in Volketswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ajradini, Endi, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bassersdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006063215, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schaltag AG, in Illnau-Effretikon, CHE-101.230.388, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2024, Publ. 1005938556).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
von Portatius, Hans Heinrich Arndt, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in München (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Savicic, Igor, von Oberglatt, in Schwerzenbach, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Buscher, Dr. Michael Manfred, von Meilen, in Meilen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: deutscher Staatsangehöriger];
Gayler, Lukas Erich, von Winterthur, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hanslin, Dominik Felix, von Kilchberg (ZH), in Mauren (LI), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005938556, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Schaltag AG, in Illnau-Effretikon, CHE-101.230.388, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 02.09.2021, Publ. 1005282523).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stier, Daniel Franz, von Zürich, in Dielsdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.