Reports for SCB Management GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SCB Management GmbH
- SCB Management GmbH has its legal headquarters in Bern, is active and operates in the sector «Sport services».
- The management of the company SCB Management GmbH, which was founded on the 07.06.1999, consists of 8 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 23.05.2024.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-105.159.708.
- Next to the company SCB Management GmbH there are 6 other active companies with an identical address. These include: BEEF2go AG, Bernische Eishockey Stiftung, Hockey Physio GmbH.
Management (8)
newest authorized signatories
Martin Plüss,
Patrik Bärtschi,
Pascal Signer,
Richard Schwander,
Stefan Moser
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.06.1999
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.4.021.318-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.159.708
CHE-116.306.764 VAT
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Dienstleistungen für die SCB Eishockey AG sowie Dritte im Bereich der Führung, Betreuung, Administration und Beratung; sie kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und Grundstücke erwerben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 23.09.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SCB Management GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006037723, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SCB Management GmbH, in Bern, CHE-105.159.708, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 98 vom 23.05.2023, Publ. 1005751499).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ebbett, Andrew Murray Brian, kanadischer Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bischoff, Peter, von Thun, in Gwatt (Thun), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bärtschi, Patrik, von Adelboden, in Niederweningen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Plüss, Martin, von Murgenthal, in Bern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005751499, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SCB Management GmbH, in Bern, CHE-105.159.708, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 174 vom 08.09.2022, Publ. 1005557376).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Raffainer, Raeto, von Scuol, in Herrenschwanden (Kirchlindach), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Signer, Pascal, von Hundwil, in Zuzwil SG, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005557376, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SCB Management GmbH, in Bern, CHE-105.159.708, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 29.06.2021, Publ. 1005231673).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Raffainer, Raeto, von Scuol, in Herrenschwanden (Kirchlindach), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Davos Platz (Davos), ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bachmann, Rolf, von Niedermuhlern, in Bolligen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Kappelen].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.