Reports for Sanitär Frei AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sanitär Frei AG
- Sanitär Frei AG has its legal headquarters in Davos Platz, is active and operates in the sector «Other construction».
- There is one active person registered in the management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 16.01.2020.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Sanitär Frei AG is the following: CHE-107.058.811.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.07.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Davos
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.004.440-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.058.811
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Projektierung, Ausführung und Reparaturen von Sanitär- und Heizungsinstallationen; die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen oder derartige Unternehmen errichten, erwerben oder finanzieren sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ITERA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Zürich | 16.01.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KMU Treuhand & Steuerberatung Rolf Bührer | Schaffhausen | <2004 | 13.05.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Santär Frei AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sanitär Frei AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004806774, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Sanitär Frei AG, in Davos, CHE-107.058.811, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 14.05.2009, S.10, Publ. 5019030). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 17.03.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ITERA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-354.484.853), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 5019030, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Sanitär Frei AG, in Davos, CH-350.3.004.440-0, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 236 vom 05.12.2007, S. 8, Publ. 4231238).
Statutenänderung:
17.03.2009.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
[Die Bestimmung über die Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme anlässlich der Gründung vom 14.07.1995 ist aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.] [gestrichen: Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft der Sanitär Frei, in Davos, gemäss Übernahmebilanz per 31.12.1994 mit Aktiven von CHF 702 293.06 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 167 062.60, wofür 100 voll liberierte Namenaktien zu CHF 5 000 ausgegeben und CHF 35 230.46 gutgeschrieben werden.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 17.03.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
KMU Treuhand & Steuerberatung Rolf Bührer, in Schaffhausen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4231238, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Sanitär Frei AG, in Davos, CH-350.3.004.440-0, Projektierung, Ausführung und Reparaturen von Sanitär- und Heizungsinstallationen, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 08.02.2006, S. 10, Publ. 3233536).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kunz, Meinrad, von Flums, in Klosters Dorf (Klosters-Serneus), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kunz, Remo, von Flums, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.