Reports for Sakura Real Estate Switzerland AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sakura Real Estate Switzerland AG
- Sakura Real Estate Switzerland AG is currently active and the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties». The legal headquarters are in Dulliken.
- Sakura Real Estate Switzerland AG was founded on 08.07.2022.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 13.10.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Sakura Real Estate Switzerland AG is the following: CHE-457.507.793.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Ismajl Hasani,
Roelof Guido Benning,
Marco Imfeld,
Michel Wessel
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.07.2022
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dulliken
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.021.731-8
UID/VAT
CHE-457.507.793
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Besitz, Verkauf, Verwaltung, Vermietung, Verpachtung und Finanzierung von Geschäftsliegenschaften mit Betriebsstättencharakter. Der Haupt- und Nebenzweck ist für alle Immobiliengeschäfte in der Schweiz ausschliesslich auf solche Liegenschaften und Grundstücke begrenzt, die als Betriebsstättengrundstücke im Sinne von Art. 2 Abs. 2 lit. a BewG gelten. Kann Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln und veräussern, Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und überhaupt alle Geschäfte tätigen, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft zusammenhängen oder diesen zu fördern geeignet sind, ferner Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TRETOR AG | Liestal | 13.07.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sakura Real Estate Switzerland AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005860136, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Sakura Real Estate Switzerland AG, in Dulliken, CHE-457.507.793, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2023, Publ. 1005788712).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gervasoni, Bruno, von Olten, in Stüsslingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005788712, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Sakura Real Estate Switzerland AG, in Dulliken, CHE-457.507.793, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 05.04.2023, Publ. 1005717907).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hasani, Ismajl, von Egerkingen, in Safenwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005717907, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Sakura Real Estate Switzerland AG, in Dulliken, CHE-457.507.793, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 134 vom 13.07.2022, Publ. 1005519700).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zwicker, Simon, von Waldkirch, in Buchs (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Imfeld, Marco, von Bellwald, in Sursee, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gervasoni, Bruno, von Olten, in Stüsslingen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.