Reports for Safe at Home AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Safe at Home AG
- Safe at Home AG with its legal headquarters in Seuzach is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «IT services». Safe at Home AG is active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 03.03.2008.
- The last commercial register change was made on 26.04.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-114.112.025.
- There are 6 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: BLUEDiamond Eventmanagement Daniel Albrecht, Consultest AG, dapp GmbH.
Management (4)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Patrick Benjamin Messmer,
Stefan Gutknecht,
Claude Schnierl,
Roman Werner Müller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
03.03.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Seuzach
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.041.418-2
UID/VAT
CHE-114.112.025
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt Entwicklung, Herstellung, Handel und Vermarktung von Kommunikationslösungen für Notruforganisationen und ähnliche Dienste sowie das Anbieten von Notrufzentralendienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SMART Audit AG | Wallisellen | 01.04.2009 | 12.07.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Safe at Home AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006018527, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Safe at Home AG, in Seuzach, CHE-114.112.025, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 147 vom 02.08.2022, Publ. 1005532729).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jouny, Yehya, libanesischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lindau, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Messmer, Patrick Benjamin, von Volken, in Pfungen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Bassersdorf, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005532729, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Safe at Home AG, in Seuzach, CHE-114.112.025, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 115 vom 16.06.2022, Publ. 1005496761).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Messmer, Patrick Benjamin, von Volken, in Bassersdorf, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005496761, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Safe at Home AG, in Seuzach, CHE-114.112.025, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 28 vom 09.02.2022, Publ. 1005400764).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brunner, Thomas Hugo, von Uster, in Meilen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Müller, Roman, von Lengnau (AG), in Lengnau (AG), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schnierl, Claude, von Zürich, in Pfäffikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.