Reports for Rychiger AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rychiger AG
- Rychiger AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Steffisburg. Rychiger AG belongs to the industry «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof» and is currently active.
- The management has 11 active persons registered.
- On the 06.02.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-101.973.644.
- There are currently 4 trademarks or applications for the company Rychiger AG in the IPI database.
- MAC MAMA Peier Anita, Personalvorsorgestiftung der Hans Rychiger AG, Rychiger Holding AG have the same address as Rychiger AG.
Management (11)
newest board members
Wolfgang Tröbs,
Bénédicte Poinssot,
Ralf Löhrl,
Prof. Dr. Roman Boutellier,
Axel Gerhard Förster
Executive board
Christoph Martin,
Mark Lauterburg,
Rolf Paul Wirz,
Patrick Taro Hutter,
Jörg Moritz Theodor Dirren
newest authorized signatories
Christoph Martin,
Mark Lauterburg,
Wolfgang Tröbs,
Rolf Paul Wirz,
Bénédicte Poinssot
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.04.1977
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Steffisburg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.007.346-1
UID/VAT
CHE-101.973.644
Sector
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung und Herstellung von Anlagen, Maschinen, Einrichtungen und Werkzeugen, insbesondere im Verpackungsbereich, sowie den Handel mit Produkten aller Art und Dienstleistungen im Zusammenhang mit den fabrizierten Produkten. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen gründen, sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, veräussern und belasten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Zürich | 03.10.2022 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Bern | 05.05.2015 | 02.10.2022 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Thun | <2004 | 04.05.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Rychiger SA
- Rychiger Ltd
- Hans Rychiger AG, Maschinenfabrik, Steffisburg
- Rychiger Hans AG, Maschinenfabrik, Steffisburg
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
16.07.2024 | active | 08249/2024 | |
25.07.2018 | active | 70099/2018 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Rychiger AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005953445, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Rychiger AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-101.973.644, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 03.10.2022, Publ. 1005573636).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kühne, Micha Daniel, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lauterbrug, Mark Andreas, von Bern, in Knebel (DK), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Martin, Christoph, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bern, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005573636, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Rychiger AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-101.973.644, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 13.04.2022, Publ. 1005449832).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-308.775.052), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tröbs, Wolfgang, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
MAZARS SA (CHE-248.814.976), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005449832, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Rychiger AG, in Steffisburg, CHE-101.973.644, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 25.01.2021, Publ. 1005081912).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Köchli, Armin, von Sarmenstorf, in Courtepin, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stalder, Marco, von Sumiswald, in Steffisburg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kühne, Micha Daniel, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wirz, Rolf Paul, von Dürrenäsch, in Hasle b. Burgdorf (Hasle bei Burgdorf), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.