Reports for Rüesch + Morf GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rüesch + Morf GmbH
- Rüesch + Morf GmbH has its legal headquarters in Islikon, is active and operates in the sector «Other construction».
- The company was founded on 08.06.2005 and has 2 persons in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 05.05.2022.
- The reported UID is CHE-112.392.776.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.06.2005
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Gachnang
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.4.018.215-4
UID/VAT
CHE-112.392.776
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Installation von Elektro-Anlagen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie Grundstücke im In- und Ausland erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rüesch + Morf GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005466237, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Rüesch + Morf GmbH, in Gachnang, CHE-112.392.776, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 30.11.2010, S.16, Publ. 5916792).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rüesch, Heinrich, von St. Margrethen, in Islikon (Gachnang), mit Einzelunterschrift, .
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Morf, Harry, von Nürensdorf, in Unterstammheim (Stammheim), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Morf, Roland, von Nürensdorf, in Guntalingen (Stammheim), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Guntalingen (Waltalingen), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 5916792, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Rüesch + Morf GmbH, in Gachnang, CH-440.4.018.215-4, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 17.02.2009, S. 19, Publ. 4884686).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Morf, Roland, von Nürensdorf, in Guntalingen (Waltalingen), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 80 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Rüesch, Heinrich, von St. Margrethen, in Islikon (Gachnang), mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift und mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: 4884686, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Rüesch + Morf GmbH, in Gachnang, CH-440.4.018.215-4, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 113 vom 14.06.2005, S. 14, Publ. 2880788).
Statutenänderung:
21.11.2008.
Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte:
Gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen durch Publikation im SHAB. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 10.11.2008 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Morf, Roland, von Nürensdorf, in Guntalingen (Waltalingen), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 80 Stammanteilen von je CHF 1'000.-- [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 50'000.--];
Rüesch, Heinrich, von St. Margrethen, in Islikon (Gachnang), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen von je CHF 1'000.-- [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 50'000.--].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.