Reports for Rudolf Steiner Schulverein Aargau
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rudolf Steiner Schulverein Aargau
- Rudolf Steiner Schulverein Aargau with its legal headquarters in Schafisheim is active. Rudolf Steiner Schulverein Aargau operates in the sector «Operation of primary schools».
- The management consists of 5 persons. The organization was founded on 30.05.1974.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 09.02.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization Rudolf Steiner Schulverein Aargau is registered under the UID CHE-103.427.039.
Management (5)
newest members of the committee
Simon Messner,
Giuseppe Caligari,
Secil Meidinger,
Susanne Zimmer,
Maria Schwind
newest authorized signatories
Simon Messner,
Giuseppe Caligari,
Secil Meidinger,
Susanne Zimmer,
Maria Schwind
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.05.1974
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Schafisheim
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.6.001.123-2
UID/VAT
CHE-103.427.039
Sector
Operation of primary schools
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung einer Schule auf der Grundlage der Pädagogik Rudolf Steiners, Schaffung der wirtschaftlichen Grundlagen für den Betrieb der Schule und für Unterricht und Betreuung, sowie Schaffung angemessener Organisationsformen zur Leitung der Schule und Gewährleistung der Qualität.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Rudolf Steiner-Schulverein Aargau
- Steiner Rudolf-Schulverein Aargau
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rudolf Steiner Schulverein Aargau
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005957606, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Rudolf Steiner Schulverein Aargau, in Schafisheim, CHE-103.427.039, Verein (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 09.11.2023, Publ. 1005881158).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rosenast, Heinz, von Kirchberg (SG), in Rupperswil, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Carlucci, Lucio, von Hittnau, in Seengen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Messner, Simon, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Rudolfstetten-Friedlisberg, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Caligari, Giuseppe, von Poschiavo, in Sarmenstorf, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meidinger, Secil, von Worb, in Schafisheim, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005881158, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Rudolf Steiner Schulverein Aargau, in Schafisheim, CHE-103.427.039, Verein (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2022, Publ. 1005393465).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wellens, Gabriele, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Schafisheim, Vizepräsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Büttikofer, Pascal, von Meinisberg, in Effingen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stauffer, Cindy, von Schlieren, in Ammerswil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Messner, Simon, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Rudolfstetten-Friedlisberg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schwind, Maria, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Hunzenschwil, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005393465, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Rudolf Steiner Schulverein Aargau, in Schafisheim, CHE-103.427.039, Verein (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 13.10.2021, Publ. 1005311606).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weibel, Martin, von Willisau, in Mägenwil, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rosenast, Heinz, von Kirchberg (SG), in Rupperswil, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.