Reports for Royal Hotel, Winter & Gstaad Palace AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Royal Hotel, Winter & Gstaad Palace AG
- Royal Hotel, Winter & Gstaad Palace AG in Gstaad is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses». Royal Hotel, Winter & Gstaad Palace AG is active.
- The management consists of 6 persons. The company was founded on 01.01.1911.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 25.09.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-101.473.212.
Management (6)
newest board members
François Pugliese,
Thierry Dassault,
Andrea Ernst Scherz,
Mark Hans Ineichen,
Martina Scherz
newest authorized signatories
François Pugliese,
Vittorio Di Carlo,
Thierry Dassault,
Andrea Ernst Scherz,
Mark Hans Ineichen
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1911
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saanen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.008.546-3
UID/VAT
CHE-101.473.212
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb des Royal Hotel, Winter & Gstaad Palace mit Sitz in Gstaad, Gemeinde Saanen, sowie die Verwaltung der dazu gehörenden Grundstücke und Liegenschaften. Die Gesellschaft kann ferner alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, und sie kann sich auch an anderen Unternehmungen, die gleiche oder ähnliche Zwecke verfolgen, beteiligen und solche Unternehmungen erwerben. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Eltschinger & Partner AG | Thalwil | 27.01.2006 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Luzern | <2004 | 26.01.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Royal Hotel, Winter & Gstaad Palace AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005844483, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Royal Hotel, Winter & Gstaad Palace AG, in Saanen, CHE-101.473.212, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 01.06.2023, Publ. 1005757792).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Muster, Adrian Dr., von Lützelflüh, in Bremgarten b. Bern (Bremgarten bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dassault, Thierry, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Paris (FR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Verwaltungsrates oder dem Vizepräsidenten des Verwaltungsrates [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten];
Pugliese, François, von Blonay - Saint-Légier, in Blonay (Blonay - Saint-Légier), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Verwaltungsrates oder dem Vizepräsidenten des Verwaltungsrates;
Scherz, Martina, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Givisiez, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Verwaltungsrates oder dem Vizepräsidentendes Verwaltungsrates [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten].
Publication number: HR02-1005757792, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Royal Hotel, Winter & Gstaad Palace AG, in Saanen, CHE-101.473.212, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 182 vom 18.09.2020, Publ. 1004981266).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Di Carlo, Vittorio, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Gstaad (Saanen), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Verwaltungsrates oder dem Vizepräsidenten des Verwaltungsrates.
Publication number: HR02-1004981266, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Royal Hotel, Winter & Gstaad Palace AG, in Saanen, CHE-101.473.212, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 29.05.2020, Publ. 1004899381).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Genecand, Pierre E., von Plan-les-Ouates, in Punta del Este (UY), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Biver, Jean-Claude, von La Tour-de-Peilz, in Schindellegi (Feusisberg), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.