Reports for Ronald Angst Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Ronald Angst Holding AG
- Ronald Angst Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Feusisberg and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions».
- Ronald Angst Holding AG was founded on 06.05.2003.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 26.04.2016. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of SZ under the UID CHE-110.036.744.
- On the same address as Ronald Angst Holding AG there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Reclimbing AG, Ronald P. Angst - Stiftung.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.05.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Feusisberg
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.026.701-9
UID/VAT
CHE-110.036.744
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die dauernde Verwaltung und die Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an in- und ausländischen Unternehmen aller Art, insbesondere auf dem Gebiete der Finanzwirtschaft. Sie kann Garantien zugunsten von verbundenen Unternehmen stellen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern sowie gewerbliche Schutzrechte, Immaterialgüterrechte und Know-how erwerben, verwalten und verwerten. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
UBG Audit AG | Zürich | <2004 | 28.03.2016 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Ronald Angst Holding Ltd
- Ronald Angst Holding SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Ronald Angst Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2800083, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Ronald Angst Holding AG, in Feusisberg, CHE-110.036.744, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 29.03.2016, Publ. 2745499). Gemäss Erklärung vom 1.4.2016 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brunner, Christian Felix, von Basel, in Nürensdorf, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Bassersdorf].
Publication number: 2745499, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Ronald Angst Holding AG, in Feusisberg, CHE-110.036.744, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 203 vom 21.10.2014, Publ. 1779833).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
UBG Unternehmensberatungs- und Treuhandgesellschaft AG (CHE-101.489.822), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 1779833, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
Ronald Angst Holding AG, in Feusisberg, CHE-110.036.744, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 26.05.2014, Publ. 1520699).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Angst, Ronald Peter, von Wil ZH, in Feusisberg, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.