Reports for Rima Salez AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rima Salez AG
- Rima Salez AG has its legal headquarters in Bottighofen, is active and operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Rima Salez AG consists of 2 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 26.06.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-101.533.044.
- altrimo ag, Amagvi Zweite AG, Baukubatur AG are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.10.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bottighofen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.030.572-3
UID/VAT
CHE-101.533.044
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Abwicklung von Handels-, Vermittlungs- und Finanzierungsgeschäften einschliesslich des Handels am Kapitalmarkt, Handel und Vermietung von Immobilien ausserhalb der Schweiz. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Revisal AG Gossau | Gossau (SG) | <2004 | 19.08.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rima Salez AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006067881, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Rima Salez AG, in Bottighofen, CHE-101.533.044, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 104 vom 01.06.2023, Publ. 1005758376).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reisinger, Günter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bergkirchen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sippel, Dieter Gerhard Karl, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Grünwald (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005758376, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Rima Salez AG, in Bottighofen, CHE-101.533.044, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 14.02.2023, Publ. 1005678180).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grüneberg, Andreas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Uhldingen-Mühlhofen (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Zähner, Jakob, von Urnäsch, in Scherzingen (Münsterlingen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reisinger, Günter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bergkirchen (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Flury, Robert, von Hägendorf, in Dübendorf, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005678180, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Rima Salez AG, bisher in Sennwald, CHE-101.533.044, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 16.06.2020, Publ. 1004911809).
Statutenänderung:
30.01.2023.
Sitz neu:
Bottighofen.
Domizil neu:
Hauptstrasse 34, 8598 Bottighofen.
Zweck neu:
Abwicklung von Handels-, Vermittlungs- und Finanzierungsgeschäften einschliesslich des Handels am Kapitalmarkt, Handel und Vermietung von Immobilien ausserhalb der Schweiz. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Göldi, Susanne Brigitte, von Sennwald, in Salez (Sennwald), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grüneberg, Andreas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Uhldingen-Mühlhofen (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Zähner, Jakob, von Urnäsch, in Scherzingen (Münsterlingen), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.