Reports for RICHOZ ET FILS SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout RICHOZ ET FILS SA
- RICHOZ ET FILS SA has its legal headquarters in Vionnaz and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Car dealership».
- The management of the company RICHOZ ET FILS SA, which was founded on the 01.02.1999, consists of 4 persons.
- On the 08.05.2020 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-107.046.357.
- The address is identical with 2 other active companies. These include: Dimab Chablais SA, DimaLoc SA, succursale de Vionnaz.
Management (4)
newest board members
Isabelle Marie Françoise Meystre-Richoz,
Christian Jean Emmanuel Richoz,
Roseline Marie-Madeleine Aymon,
Viviane Marie Véronique Richoz
newest authorized signatories
Isabelle Marie Françoise Meystre-Richoz,
Christian Jean Emmanuel Richoz,
Roseline Marie-Madeleine Aymon,
Viviane Marie Véronique Richoz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.02.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Vionnaz
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.003.536-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.046.357
Sector
Car dealership
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un garage automobile, avec services de réparation et de vente et toutes activités convergentes dans le domaine automobile, y compris financières ou commerciales
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KUNZLE FIDUCIAIRE ET GERANCE SA | Monthey | 29.01.2008 | 29.01.2014 | |
Fiduciaire Fiduwa SA | Monthey | <2004 | 28.01.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: RICHOZ ET FILS SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004885970, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
RICHOZ ET FILS S.A., à Vionnaz, CHE-107.046.357, société anonyme (No. FOSC 205 du 23.10.2017, Publ. 3825489).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route du Simplon 16, 1895 Vionnaz.
Publication number: 3825489, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
RICHOZ ET FILS S.A., à Vionnaz, CHE-107.046.357, société anonyme (No. FOSC 20 du 30.01.2014, Publ. 1316987).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Richoz, Edgar, de Esmonts et Vauderens, à Vionnaz, administrateur unique, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Richoz, Christian Jean Emmanuel, de Ursy, à Vionnaz, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Meystre-Richoz, Isabelle Marie Françoise, de Ursy, à Chexbres, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Aymon, Roseline Marie-Madeleine, de Ursy, à Ayent, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux;
Richoz, Viviane Marie Véronique, de Ursy, à Monthey, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 1316987, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
RICHOZ ET FILS S.A., à Vionnaz, CHE-107.046.357, société anonyme (No. FOSC 115 du 17.06.2010, p. 25, Publ. 5681144). Selon déclaration du 29.11.2013, il est renoncé à un contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Künzle Fiduciaire et Gérance SA, à Monthey, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.