Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Liability
Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Richard Wälti, Rechtsberatung
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.03.1999
Deletion from the commercial register
12.06.2015
Legal form
Sole proprietorship
Legal headquarters of the company
Oetwil am See
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.1.016.925-7
UID/VAT
CHE-105.026.786
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beratung und Mandatsübernahmen im Ehegüter- und Erbrecht, Gesellschafts- und Immobiliarrecht sowie Treuhandgeschäfte.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Wälti Richard, Rechtsberatung
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Richard Wälti, Rechtsberatung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2202605, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Richard Wälti, Rechtsberatung, in Oetwil am See, CHE-105.026.786, Einzelunternehmen (SHAB Nr. 63 vom 01.04.2005, S. 24, Publ. 2772476). Das Einzelunternehmen ist infolge Geschäftsaufgabe erloschen.
Publication number: 2772476, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Richard Wälti, Rechtsberatung, in Oetwil am See, CH-020.1.016.925-7, Beratung und Mandatsübernahmen im Ehegüter- und Erbrecht, Gesellschafts- und Immobiliarrecht, Einzelfirma (SHAB Nr. 140 vom 22.07.1999, S. 5001).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Walder, Kurt, von Oetwil am See, in Hombrechtikon, mit Einzelprokura.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baumann, Peter, von Hombrechtikon, in Oetwil am See, mit Einzelprokura.
Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Richard Wälti, Rechtsberatung, in O e t w i l a m S e e, Beratung und Mandatsübernahmen im Ehegüter- und Erbrecht, Gesellschafts- und Immobiliarrecht, Einzelfirma (SHAB Nr. 45 vom 05.03.1999, S. 1471).Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften: Holenstein, Sonja, von Amsoldingen und Bütschwil, in Stäfa, mit Einzelprokura.