Reports for Rhyner Treuhand GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Rhyner Treuhand GmbH
- Rhyner Treuhand GmbH has its legal headquarters in Ennenda and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Fiduciary services».
- Rhyner Treuhand GmbH has 2 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 30.08.2023.
- The company Rhyner Treuhand GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-113.807.998.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.09.2007
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.4.004.732-6
UID/VAT
CHE-113.807.998
Sector
Fiduciary services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Übernahme und Ausführung von Arbeiten im Treuhandwesen, insbesondere in den Bereichen Buchhaltung, Steuern, Beratung sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im administrativen und kaufmännischen Bereich. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen in- und ausländischen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder diese erwerben sowie Grundeigentum erwerben und veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- KMU-Support Linth GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Rhyner Treuhand GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005826673, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Rhyner Treuhand GmbH, in Glarus, CHE-113.807.998, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 111 vom 11.06.2021, Publ. 1005214372).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rhyner-Maron, Daniela, von Glarus Süd, in Riedern (Glarus), Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 3 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rhyner, Nick Kevin, von Glarus Süd, in Riedern (Glarus), Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005214372, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
KMU-Support Linth GmbH, in Glarus, CHE-113.807.998, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 169 vom 03.09.2013, S.0, Publ. 1056743).
Statutenänderung:
07.06.2021.
Firma neu:
Rhyner Treuhand GmbH.
Domizil neu:
Obere Allmeind 1a, 8755 Ennenda.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Übernahme und Ausführung von Arbeiten im Treuhandwesen, insbesondere in den Bereichen Buchhaltung, Steuern, Beratung sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im administrativen und kaufmännischen Bereich. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen in- und ausländischen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder diese erwerben sowie Grundeigentum erwerben und veräussern.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rhyner, Beat, von Glarus Süd, in Riedern (Glarus), Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 16 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Rhyner, Nick Kevin, von Glarus Süd, in Riedern (Glarus), Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Rhyner-Maron, Daniela, von Glarus Süd, in Riedern (Glarus), Gesellschafterin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 3 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: von Glarus Süd und Bonaduz, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 3 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 7'000.00].
Publication number: 1056743, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
KMU-Support Linth GmbH, in Glarus, CH-160.4.004.732-6, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 74 vom 14.04.2011, Publ. 6122376).
Domizil neu:
Stüssihoschet 9, 8750 Riedern.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Feldmann-Gisler, Denise, von Glarus, Glarus Süd und Flüelen, in Glarus, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 7'000.00;
Weber, Urs, von Glarus, in Riedern (Glarus), Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 7'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rhyner-Maron, Daniela, von Glarus Süd und Bonaduz, in Riedern (Glarus), Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 3 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 7'000.00 [bisher: Gesellschafterin mit Einzelunterschrift und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 7'000.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.