Reports for RGR Holding SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout RGR Holding SA
- RGR Holding SA has its legal headquarters in Lonay, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 23.12.2020.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 16.08.2024.
- The company RGR Holding SA is registered under the UID CHE-194.775.497.
- Brodard & Billiaert SA, FL Architecture & associés SA, FL Investissements SA have the same address as RGR Holding SA.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.12.2020
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lonay
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.193.899-7
UID/VAT
CHE-194.775.497
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but d'acquérir, de vendre, de gérer et d'administrer des participations financières en tant que holding dans toutes sociétés industrielles, financières, commerciales, aussi bien en Suisse qu'à l'étranger (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: RGR Holding SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006108604, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
RGR Holding SA, à Bière, CHE-194.775.497 (FOSC du 12.07.2023, p. 0/1005793948). Statuts modifiés le 07.08.2024. Siège transféré à Lonay.
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin du Bief 6, 1027 Lonay.
Nouvelles communications aux actionnaires:
en forme écrite ou par courriel.
Publication number: HR02-1005793948, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
RGR Holding SA, à Bière, CHE-194.775.497 (FOSC du 29.12.2020, p. 0/1005061734). Revaz Christophe Antoine, Grossu-Viziru Horia Camil Claude Ion et Richert Christian Gilles Roger ne sont plus administrateurs;
leur signature est radiée. Rochat Virgile, de L'Abbaye, à Plan-les-Ouates, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR01-1005061734, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
RGR Holding SA, à Bière, Rue de la Tillette 1, 1145 Bière, CHE-194.775.497. Nouvelle société anonyme.
Statuts:
16 décembre 2020.
But:
la société a pour but d'acquérir, de vendre, de gérer et d'administrer des participations financières en tant que holding dans toutes sociétés industrielles, financières, commerciales, aussi bien en Suisse qu'à l'étranger (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par courrier écrit, par télécopie ou par courrier électronique.
Administration:
Revaz Christophe Antoine, de Salvan, à Hauteville, président, Grossu-Viziru Horia Camil Claude Ion, de Niederrohrdorf, à Grandson, et Richert Christian Gilles Roger, de Genève, à Onex, les trois avec signature collective à deux. Selon déclaration du 16 décembre 2020, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.