Reports for Remimag Gastronomie AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Remimag Gastronomie AG
- Remimag Gastronomie AG has its legal headquarters in Rothenburg and is active. It operates in the sector «Business management and administration».
- The company was founded on 31.08.1982.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 23.01.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Remimag Gastronomie AG is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-107.902.654.
- Eltschinger Holding AG, it-crafts AG, Katjaboat SA are registered at the same address.
Management (9)
newest board members
Erika Müller-Meier,
Guido Franz Egli,
Stephan Josef Kurmann,
Bastian Stephan Eltschinger,
Florian Peter Eltschinger
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Krigl,
Cornelia Willi,
Erika Müller-Meier,
Guido Franz Egli,
Stephan Josef Kurmann
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.08.1982
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rothenburg
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.009.532-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.902.654
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führung von Hotel- und Restaurationsbetrieben im Managementverhältnis; Uebernahme von Beratungen und Verwaltungen; Beteiligungen an Gesellschaften des Gastgewerbes; Miete und Leitung von Hotel- und Restaurationsbetrieben; Erwerb, Veräusserung oder Vermittlung von Liegenschaften.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
OPES AG | Luzern | 23.08.2016 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Aregger Schleiss Bucheli AG für Wirtschaftsberatung | Kriens | <2004 | 22.08.2016 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Remimag Gastronomie AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005941238, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Remimag Gastronomie AG, in Rothenburg, CHE-107.902.654, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 26.04.2023, Publ. 1005732324).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Soraperra, Ivano, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Buchrain, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005732324, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Remimag Gastronomie AG, in Rothenburg, CHE-107.902.654, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 157 vom 16.08.2022, Publ. 1005541726).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brügger, Kerstin, von Gebenstorf, in Arni (AG), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Krigl, Daniel, von Basel, in Uetikon am See, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005541726, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Remimag Gastronomie AG, in Rothenburg, CHE-107.902.654, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 246 vom 17.12.2020, Publ. 1005050202).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eltschinger, Peter, von Plaffeien, in Hildisrieden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Zumholz, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Eltschinger, Bastian, von Plaffeien, in Kriens, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Zumholz, in Zug, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Eltschinger, Florian, von Plaffeien, in Sempach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Zumholz, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Brügger, Kerstin, von Gebenstorf, in Arni (AG), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: Wiedemeier, Kerstin, in Urdorf].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.