Reports for Raststätte Glarnerland AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Raststätte Glarnerland AG
- Raststätte Glarnerland AG with its legal headquarters in Niederurnen is active. Raststätte Glarnerland AG operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Raststätte Glarnerland AG consists of 6 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 06.08.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company Raststätte Glarnerland AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.953.280.
Management (6)
newest board members
Elias Meier,
Michael Kasper,
Rudolf Umberg,
Michael Leuenberger,
Raoul Albert König
newest authorized signatories
Elias Meier,
Michael Kasper,
Rudolf Umberg,
Michael Leuenberger,
Raoul Albert König
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.04.1985
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus Nord
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.3.001.085-0
UID/VAT
CHE-101.953.280
CHE-116.311.185 VAT
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb, die Verwaltung und Verwertung von Konzessionen, Baurechten und anderen Rechten zum Betrieb von Nebenanlagen an Autobahnen und -strassen. Insbesondere soll die Erfüllung der Konzession und der damit verbundenen Bedingungen des Kantons Glarus für den Bau, Betrieb und Unterhalt der Autobahnraststätte an der Nationalstrasse N3 im Raume Niederurnen sichergestellt werden. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundeigentum erwerben und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die mit ihrem Zweck direkt oder indirekt zusammenhängen. Die Gesellschaft wird die von ihr finanzierten und verwalteten Anlagen verpachten oder vermieten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SMART Audit AG | Glarus Nord | 06.08.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Glaronia Treuhand AG | Glarus Nord | <2004 | 05.08.2024 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Mövenpick Raststätte Glarnerland AG, Niederurnen
- Mövenpick Raststätte Glarnerland AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Raststätte Glarnerland AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006100674, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Raststätte Glarnerland AG, in Glarus Nord, CHE-101.953.280, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 163 vom 24.08.2023, Publ. 1005822832).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sommer, Michael Andreas Otto, von Sumiswald, in Obfelden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Glaronia Treuhand AG (CHE-106.897.016), in Ziegelbrücke (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Elias, von Nottwil, in Nottwil, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
SMART Audit AG (CHE-395.587.404), in Ziegelbrücke (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005822832, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Raststätte Glarnerland AG, in Glarus Nord, CHE-101.953.280, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 24.03.2022, Publ. 1005434481).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Koller, Dieter Raymond, von Zürich, in Forch (Maur), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kasper, Michael, von Klosters, in Weinfelden, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005434481, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Raststätte Glarnerland AG, in Glarus Nord, CHE-101.953.280, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 110 vom 10.06.2021, Publ. 1005212448).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Glaronia Treuhand AG (CHE-106.897.016), in Ziegelbrücke (Glarus Nord), Revisionsstelle [bisher: in Glarus].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.