Reports for RAMSEIER AACHTAL AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout RAMSEIER AACHTAL AG
- RAMSEIER AACHTAL AG has its legal headquarters in Oberaach, is active and operates in the sector «Production of comestibles».
- The management of the company RAMSEIER AACHTAL AG consists of 5 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 27.04.2022.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company RAMSEIER AACHTAL AG is the following: CHE-100.631.046.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: LANDI Aachtal, Genossenschaft, LANDI Markt Aachtal AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Kurt Friedli,
Christoph Richli,
Daniel Braun,
Christoph Suter
newest authorized signatories
Kurt Friedli,
Beat Hubmann,
Christoph Richli,
Daniel Braun,
Christoph Suter
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.03.1987
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Amriswil
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.001.781-5
UID/VAT
CHE-100.631.046
Sector
Production of comestibles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verarbeitung von Obst und Früchten zu Obst- und Fruchtsaft-Konzentraten. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Sursee | 30.04.2010 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | <2004 | 29.04.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Pomog AG
- Fruttador AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: RAMSEIER AACHTAL AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005459781, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
RAMSEIER AACHTAL AG, in Amriswil, CHE-100.631.046, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 15.04.2020, Publ. 1004871247).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tschopp, Franz, von Knutwil, in Heldswil (Hohentannen), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fisch, Hugo, von Muolen, in Häggenschwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Friedli, Kurt, von Ersigen, in Riedt b. Erlen (Erlen), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hubmann, Beat, von Bichelsee-Balterswil, in Eschlikon TG (Eschlikon), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004871247, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
RAMSEIER AACHTAL AG, in Amriswil, CHE-100.631.046, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 23.04.2019, Publ. 1004615115).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Consoni, Christian, von Horn, in Gipf-Oberfrick, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Elmiger, Hans Rudolf, von Dagmersellen, in Luzern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Richli, Christoph, von Ballwil, in Ballwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004615115, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
RAMSEIER AACHTAL AG, in Amriswil, CHE-100.631.046, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 05.10.2015, S.0, Publ. 2408107).
Weitere Adressen:
Merkurstrasse 1, 6210 Sursee.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bischof, Daniel, von Stein SG, in Mörschwil, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Braun, Daniel, von Altnau, in Altnau, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.