Address
c/o RBT AG
Plazza dal Mulin 6
7500 St. Moritz
Reports for Raich Spezialmontagen Schweiz GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Raich Spezialmontagen Schweiz GmbH
- Raich Spezialmontagen Schweiz GmbH has its legal headquarters in St. Moritz and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Other construction».
- The management of the company Raich Spezialmontagen Schweiz GmbH consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 20.03.2019.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 23.08.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Raich Spezialmontagen Schweiz GmbH is the following: CHE-206.726.993.
- The address is identical with 21 other active companies. These include: Arrow Holding AG, Atelier Anna Ferré, Bata Schuh Stiftung.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.03.2019
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Moritz
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.4.005.423-2
UID/VAT
CHE-206.726.993
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Durchführung von Montagearbeiten für Seilbahnsysteme; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wieser & Wieser AG, Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft | Zuoz | 23.08.2024 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Raich Spezialmontagen Schweiz GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006113071, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Raich Spezialmontagen Schweiz GmbH, in St. Moritz, CHE-206.726.993, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 25.03.2019, Publ. 1004595026). [gestrichen: Gemäss Erklärung vom 11.03.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Raich, Marco, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Arzl im Pitztal (AT), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Infanger, Peter, von Isenthal, in Seedorf (UR), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wieser & Wieser AG, Treuhand- und Revisionsgesellschaft (CHE-109.421.408), in Zuoz, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR01-1004595026, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Raich Spezialmontagen Schweiz GmbH, in St. Moritz, CHE-206.726.993, c/o RBT AG, Plazza dal Mulin 6, 7500 St. Moritz, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
11.03.2019.
Zweck:
Durchführung von Montagearbeiten für Seilbahnsysteme;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung vom 11.03.2019 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Raich Spezialmontage GmbH (467254), in Arzl im Pitztal (AT), Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Raich, Marco, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Arzl im Pitztal (AT), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Telser, Heinrich, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Sils im Engadin/Segl, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.