Address
c/o Curnera Holding AG
Steinbruchstrasse 12
7000 Chur
Reports for Raetia Bau GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Raetia Bau GmbH
- Raetia Bau GmbH has its legal headquarters in Chur and is active. It operates in the sector «General structural engineering».
- The management of the company Raetia Bau GmbH consists of 2 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 21.11.2013.
- The company is registered in the commercial register GR under the UID CHE-115.116.729.
- Companies with an identical address: Albin Kistler AG, Zweigniederlassung Chur, Alinaria AG, Astrid Aschpurwis Stiftung.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.10.2009
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Chur
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.4.002.621-2
UID/VAT
CHE-115.116.729
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Erstellung, den Verkauf, die Vermietung und Verwaltung von Bauten; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Raetia Anlagenbau GmbH
- Raetia Anlangenbau GmbH
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Raetia Bau GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1193507, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Raetia Anlagenbau GmbH, in Chur, CHE-115.116.729, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 200 vom 15.10.2009, S. 12, Publ. 5295214).
Statutenänderung:
12.11.2013.
Firma neu:
Raetia Bau GmbH.
Domizil neu:
c/o Curnera Holding AG, Steinbruchstrasse 12, 7000 Chur.
Zweck neu:
Die Erstellung, den Verkauf, die Vermietung und Verwaltung von Bauten;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Nay, Beath, von Trun, in Chur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Curnera Holding AG (CHE-421.000.769), in Chur, Gesellschafterin, mit 20 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00;
Osadnik, Heinrich Peter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in St. Peter (Arosa), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5295214, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 195 vom 08.10.2009, S. 10, publizierten TR-Eintrags Nr. 4815 vom 02.10.2009. Raetia Anlangenbau GmbH, in Chur, CH-350.4.002.621-2, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 195 vom 08.10.2009, S. 10, Publ. 5284168).
Firma richtig:
Raetia Anlagenbau GmbH.
Publication number: 5284168, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Raetia Anlangenbau GmbH, in Chur, CH-350.4.002.621-2, c/o Persadmin Nay, Beath Nay, Obere Gasse 17, 7000 Chur, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
1.10.2009.
Zweck:
Ausführen und planen von Anlagen wie Brunnenstuben, Rohrleitungsinstallationen und allgemeinen Schlosserarbeiten;
vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000. Nebenleistungspflichten gemäss Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich. Gemäss Erklärung des Gründers vom 01.10.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Nay, Beath, von Trun, in Chur, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 20 Stammanteilen von je CHF 1'000.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.