Reports for R. Steiner AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout R. Steiner AG
- R. Steiner AG has its legal headquarters in Oberkulm and is active. It operates in the sector «General structural engineering».
- The company was founded on 29.04.2005 and has 4 persons in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 29.05.2017. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- In the commercial register the company R. Steiner AG is registered under the UID CHE-112.337.323.
- Next to the company R. Steiner AG there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Bertschi Immobilien AG, Kulmer Druck, H.R. Jenni.
Management (4)
newest board members
lic. oec. Oskar Sager,
Joel Bertschi,
René Bertschi,
Thomas Bertschi
newest authorized signatories
lic. oec. Oskar Sager,
Joel Bertschi,
René Bertschi,
Thomas Bertschi
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.04.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Oberkulm
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.026.497-4
UID/VAT
CHE-112.337.323
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung und Ausführung von Um- und Anbauten, Renovationen und sämtlicher Plattenarbeiten sowie Erbringen von Baudienstleistungen; die Gesellschaft kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, Zweigniederlassungen errichten, Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie Finanzierungen aller Art tätigen, insbesondere Darlehen an Dritte oder an Aktionäre gewähren oder solche sicherstellen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Wiget Treuhand AG | Oberentfelden | 06.05.2005 | 02.05.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: R. Steiner AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3547485, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
R. Steiner AG, in Oberkulm, CHE-112.337.323, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 118 vom 21.06.2016, Publ. 2902725).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steiner, Rudolf, von Walterswil (BE), in Oberkulm, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sager, Oskar, von Gränichen, in Seon, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2902725, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
R. Steiner AG, in Oberkulm, CHE-112.337.323, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 03.05.2010, Publ. 5613452).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Siegenthaler, Laura, von Büren an der Aare, in Oberkulm, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steiner, Rudolf, von Walterswil (BE), in Oberkulm, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bertschi, Thomas, von Dürrenäsch, in Staffelbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bertschi, René, von Dürrenäsch, in Teufenthal (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bertschi, Joel, von Dürrenäsch, in Aarau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5613452, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
R. Steiner AG, in Oberkulm, CH-400.3.026.497-4, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 26.05.2005, S. 2, Publ. 2854388).
Statutenänderung:
25.06.2009.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an Aktionäre erfolgen mit eingeschriebenem Brief;
mit Telefax oder mit elektronischer Post an die letztgenannte Adresse des Aktionärs. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 25.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wiget Treuhand AG, in Oberentfelden, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.