Reports for R. Häsler AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout R. Häsler AG
- R. Häsler AG has its legal headquarters in Möhlin and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Other construction».
- The company was founded on 22.11.2011 and has 8 persons in its management.
- The last commercial register change was made on 08.02.2022. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- R. Häsler AG is registered in the Canton of AG under the UID CHE-366.958.208.
- Companies with an identical address: Blumenladen Schär, HHL Holding AG, Kämpfer Beteiligungs AG.
Management (8)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Julian Matzner,
Philipp Robert Brugger,
Maurizio Ferraina,
Stefan Nägele,
Tobias Mathis
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.11.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Möhlin
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.034.758-2
UID/VAT
CHE-366.958.208
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Planung, Installation und Wartung von Heizungs- und Lüftungsanlagen sowie anderen Anwendungen von Alternativenergien; kann Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, Zweigniederlassungen und Agenturen errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Lachen | 27.01.2012 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FORVIS MAZARS SA | Zürich | 25.11.2011 | 26.01.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Häsler Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: R. Häsler AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005400213, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
R. Häsler AG, in Möhlin, CHE-366.958.208, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 24.09.2021, Publ. 1005298365).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vogt, Michael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Efringen-Kirchen (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Osswald, Hans-Peter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Malsburg-Marzell (DE), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Matzner, Juian, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bad Säckingen (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005298365, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
R. Häsler AG, in Möhlin, CHE-366.958.208, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2021, Publ. 1005275817).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schönenberger, Lorella, von Mosnang, in Möhlin, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005275817, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
R. Häsler AG, in Möhlin, CHE-366.958.208, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 02.07.2020, Publ. 1004926945).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brugger, Philipp Robert, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Steinen (DE), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.