Reports for QBent GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout QBent GmbH
- QBent GmbH has its legal headquarters in Lenzburg, is active and operates in the sector «Other services: entertainment and recreation».
- QBent GmbH was founded on 27.04.2017.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 09.11.2018.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company QBent GmbH is the following: CHE-325.167.505.
- In the IPI there are 3 trademarks or applications registered by the company QBent GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.04.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Lenzburg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.4.442.590-3
UID/VAT
CHE-325.167.505
Sector
Other services: entertainment and recreation
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Angebot von Events und Dienstleistungen im Bereich Mode sowie Durchführung von kulturellen Fördermassnahmen und Jugendprojekten, Betrieb eines Musikverlages, Durchführung von allen einschlägigen Geschäften der Musikbranche, Handel mit Waren aller Art sowie Halten und Verwalten von Lizenzen, Patenten und anderen Schutzrechten; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
QBent | 20.09.2017 | active | 55984/2017 |
07.06.2017 | active | 55987/2017 |
Newest SOGC notifications: QBent GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004494585, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
QBent GmbH, in Lenzburg, CHE-325.167.505, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 84 vom 02.05.2017, Publ. 3498123).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brillante, Angelo Rosario, von Triengen, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Quizeidioco, Francisco, von Uster, in Lenzburg, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 3498123, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
QBent GmbH, in Lenzburg, CHE-325.167.505, Othmarsingerstrasse 37a, 5600 Lenzburg, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
13.04.2017.
Zweck:
Angebot von Events und Dienstleistungen im Bereich Mode sowie Durchführung von kulturellen Fördermassnahmen und Jugendprojekten, Betrieb eines Musikverlages, Durchführung von allen einschlägigen Geschäften der Musikbranche, Handel mit Waren aller Art sowie Halten und Verwalten von Lizenzen, Patenten und anderen Schutzrechten;
kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax. Gemäss Erklärung aller Gründer vom 13.04.2017 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Brillante, Angelo Rosario, von Triengen, in Zürich, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Quizeidioco, Francisco, von Uster, in Lenzburg, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 100 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.