Reports for 19 Edge AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout 19 Edge AG
- 19 Edge AG has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «IT services».
- The management of the company 19 Edge AG, which was founded on the 10.06.2021, consists of 2 persons.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 22.04.2024. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-469.823.976.
- Altea Long COVID Network, AMCS Switzerland AG, Blue Alpine GmbH are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.06.2021
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.074.324-7
UID/VAT
CHE-469.823.976
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung und den Vertrieb von Software sowie damit zusammenhängende Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Sie kann Patente, Marken, Lizenzen, Herstellungsverfahren und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, entwickeln, verwalten und verwerten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Pushdat AG
- Pushdat SA
- Pushdat Ltd
- DCLXVI GmbH
- DCLXVI Sàrl
- DCLXVI LLC
- DCLXVI Sagl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: 19 Edge AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006014064, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Pushdat AG, in Zürich, CHE-469.823.976, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 24.05.2023, Publ. 1005752429).
Statutenänderung:
02.04.2024.
Firma neu:
19 Edge AG.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
[Die Übersetzungen werden im Handelsregister gelöscht].
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung und den Vertrieb von Software sowie damit zusammenhängende Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen. Sie kann Patente, Marken, Lizenzen, Herstellungsverfahren und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, entwickeln, verwalten und verwerten.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Simon, David Oliver, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rohner, Raphael, von Walzenhausen, in Stäfa, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Graf, Andreas Albert, von Rebstein, in Balgach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.