Reports for PROMETECH SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PROMETECH SA
- PROMETECH SA with its legal headquarters in Aclens is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Locksmithery, smithy and workshops». PROMETECH SA is active.
- The management of the company PROMETECH SA consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 23.09.1999.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 27.05.2022.
- The reported UID is CHE-105.242.686.
- Companies with the same address as PROMETECH SA: Belli Transports et Déménagements SA, Prometech Sàrl Atelier mécanique.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.09.1999
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aclens
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.145.240-7
UID/VAT
CHE-105.242.686
Sector
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrication de pièces, service après-vente, réparation de machines et outils et sous-traitance de tous travaux ayant traits à la mécanique.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Staehli SA | Morrens (VD) | 05.04.2013 | 26.05.2022 | |
MGS Fiduciaire SA | Morrens (VD) | 07.10.1999 | 04.04.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- PROMETECH S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PROMETECH SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005483385, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
"PROMETECH S.A.", à Aclens, CHE-105.242.686 (FOSC du 02.05.2019, p. 0/1004621996). Statuts modifiés le 12.05.2022.
Nouvelle graphie de la raison de commerce:
PROMETECH SA.
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin du Coteau 29, 1123 Aclens. Raemy Julien est nommé président. Raemy Gérard, qui est désormais à Bussigny, n'est plus président.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Fiduciaire Staehli SA (CH-550-1107744-0) n'est plus organe de révision. Selon déclaration du 12.05.2022, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.