Reports for ProConseils Services SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout ProConseils Services SA
- ProConseils Services SA from Bulle operates in the sector «Services for insurance and pensions» and is active.
- The management has 10 active persons registered.
- The last commercial register change was made on 07.05.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the company ProConseils Services SA is registered under the UID CHE-113.923.475.
- Companies with an identical address: decroux+piccolo sàrl, FribourHYPO SA.
Management (10)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Jean-Maurice Cailler,
Cédric Defferrard,
David Cochet,
Sébastien Messina,
Claude-Alain Baechler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.11.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bulle
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.538.960-6
UID/VAT
CHE-113.923.475
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Courtage dans le domaine de l'assurance, ainsi que les les domaines bancaire, financier et immobilier, ainsi que toute autre activité liée au développement de la société.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA | Martigny | 16.05.2023 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Audit Intercom (conseils) SA | Lausanne | 12.12.2019 | 15.05.2023 | |
Fiduconsult Bulle SA | Bulle | 02.10.2018 | 11.12.2019 | |
Fiduconsult S.A. | Bulle | 19.11.2007 | 01.10.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: ProConseils Services SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006026544, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
ProConseils Services SA, à Bulle, CHE-113.923.475 (FOSC du 05.04.2024, p. 0/1006001938).
Personne radiée:
Feret Gregory, administrateur, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1006001938, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
ProConseils Services SA, à Bulle, CHE-113.923.475 (FOSC du 16.05.2023, p. 0/1005747350).
Personnes inscrites modifiées:
Niclasse Déborah, signature collective à deux, maintenant signature collective à deux avec un directeur;
Nicolet Jean-Marc, signature collective à deux, maintenant signature collective à deux avec un directeur;
Sottas Emilie Murielle, signature collective à deux, maintenant signature collective à deux avec un directeur.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Cochet David, de France, à Collonge-Bellerive, directeur, signature collective à deux;
Messina Sébastien, de Lutry, à Oron, directeur, signature collective à deux;
Defferrard Cédric, de Chenens, à Bulle, signature collective à deux avec un directeur.
Publication number: HR02-1005747350, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
ProConseils Services SA, à Bulle, CHE-113.923.475 (FOSC du 14.04.2023, p. 0/1005723945).
Personne radiée:
Audit Intercom (conseils) SA (CHE-102.072.028), organe de révision.
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA (CHE-105.760.685), à Martigny, organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.