Reports for Pro-Metall Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pro-Metall Holding AG
- Pro-Metall Holding AG in Kestenholz is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of investment companies». Pro-Metall Holding AG is active.
- The management of the company Pro-Metall Holding AG, which was founded on the 30.10.2002, consists of 3 persons.
- On the 18.04.2019 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register SO under the UID CHE-109.899.773.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.10.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Kestenholz
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.002.643-9
UID/VAT
CHE-109.899.773
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Finanzierung, Verwaltung und Kontrolle von Beteiligungen und Vermögenswerten jeder Art im In- und Ausland. Kann sich an ähnlichen Unternehmungen beteiligen und Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Jorns Treuhand AG | Oensingen | 03.07.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pro-Metall Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004613766, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Pro-Metall Holding AG, in Kestenholz, CHE-109.899.773, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 03.07.2012, S.0, Publ. 6748968).
Statutenänderung:
12.04.2019.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 366'000.00 [bisher: CHF 105'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 366'000.00 [bisher: CHF 105'000.00].
Aktien neu:
366'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 [bisher: 105'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00]. Ordentliche Kapitalerhöhung.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
[Die Bestimmung betreffend die Sacheinlage bei der Gründung der Gesellschaft vom 21.10.2002 ist im Sinne von Art. 628 Abs. 4 OR aus den Statuten gestrichen worden.] [gestrichen: Sacheinlage: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung gemäss Sacheinlagevertrag vom 21.10.2002 75 Inhaberaktien zu 1000.-- der "Pro-Metall Handel AG", in Kestenholz, wofür 75'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.-- ausgegeben werden.].
Sacheinlage:
Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Kapitalerhöhung vom 12.04.2019 gemäss Vertrag vom 12.04.2019 261 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 der "prometall handel ag", in Kestenholz (CHE-103.935.583), wofür 261'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 ausgegeben werden.
Publication number: 6748968, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Pro-Metall Holding AG, in Kestenholz, CH-241.3.002.643-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 126 vom 01.07.2005, S. 15, Publ. 2911648).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jorns Treuhand Oensingen, in Oensingen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jorns Treuhand AG (CH-241.3.002.878-3), in Oensingen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2911648, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Pro-Metall Holding AG, in Kestenholz, CH-241.3.002.643-9, Erwerb, Finanzierung, Verwaltung und Kontrolle von Beteiligungen und Vermögenswerten jeder Art im In- und Ausland, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 214 vom 05.11.2002, S. 10, Publ. 714860).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ramseier, Urs, von Eggiwil, in Wangen an der Aare, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates];
Vifian, Peter, von Guggisberg, in Aarwangen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.