Reports for PRIVATIMME SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PRIVATIMME SA
- PRIVATIMME SA is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Sion.
- PRIVATIMME SA has 2 persons entered in its management.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 27.01.2021. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register VS under the UID CHE-101.385.625.
Management (2)
newest board members
Christel Anny Magali Comina-Cardi,
Eric René Aloïs Eugène Comina
newest authorized signatories
Christel Anny Magali Comina-Cardi,
Eric René Aloïs Eugène Comina
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.09.1987
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.675.987-1
UID/VAT
CHE-101.385.625
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but toutes opérations immobilières tant en Suisse qu'à l'étranger (à I'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE), ainsi que tous conseils et services dans ce domaine. Elle peut faire, soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, mobilières ou immobilières (à I'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE) se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but et s'intéresser, sous toutes formes, à toutes entreprises similaires.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- AMOOS PARTNERS SA
- Toffel Conseils Immobiliers SA
- Jawer Estate SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PRIVATIMME SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005085297, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
PRIVATIMME SA, à Meyrin, CHE-101.385.625 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225832). Par suite du transfert de son siège à Sion, la société est inscrite au registre du commerce du Valais Central;
par conséquent, elle est radiée d'office du registre de Genève.
Publication number: HR02-1005085255, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
PRIVATIMME SA, précédemment à Meyrin, CHE-101.385.625, société anonyme (No. FOSC 8 du 02.11.2010).
Modification des statuts:
17.12.2020.
Nouveau siège:
Sion.
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue du Vieux-Moulin 6, 1950 Sion.
Nouveau but:
La société a pour but toutes opérations immobilières tant en Suisse qu'à l'étranger (à I'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE), ainsi que tous conseils et services dans ce domaine. Elle peut faire, soit pour son compte, soit pour le compte de tiers, toutes opérations financières, commerciales, mobilières ou immobilières (à I'exclusion des opérations prohibées par la LFAIE) se rattachant directement ou indirectement à son but et s'intéresser, sous toutes formes, à toutes entreprises similaires.
Nouvelles actions:
100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.00 [précédemment: 100 actions au porteur de CHF 1'000.00].
Nouvelles communications:
Communication aux actionnaires: par lettre ou par courriel. [biffé: Administration: 1 ou plusieurs membres].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Toffel, Jean-Louis, de La Roche, à Neyruz (FR), administrateur, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Comina, Eric René Aloïs Eugène, de Mont-Noble, à Sion, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle;
Comina-Cardi, Christel Anny Magali, de Mont-Noble, à Sion, administratrice et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle. [Modification des statuts sur des points non soumis à publication].
Publication number: 5877384, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
PRIVATIMME SA, à Meyrin, CH-660-0675987-1 (FOSC du 21.09.2004, p. 6/2459348).
Communication aux actionnaires:
Feuille Officielle Suisse du Commerce. Nouveaux statuts du 27.09.2010. Selon déclaration de l'administrateur du 27.09.2010, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint. Berset Christian n'est plus organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.