Reports for Prevo-conseils Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Prevo-conseils Sàrl
- Prevo-conseils Sàrl has its legal headquarters in Riddes and is active. It operates in the sector «Services for insurance and pensions».
- The company was founded on 29.03.2005.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 27.07.2011. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of VS under the UID CHE-112.290.667.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.03.2005
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Riddes
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.4.007.046-4
UID/VAT
CHE-112.290.667
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes activités de courtage en matière d'assurances, de fiscalité et de finances ainsi que toutes transactions convergentes, en Suisse et à l'étranger, y compris immobilières.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Prevo-conseils Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6274048, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Prevo-conseils Sàrl, à Riddes, CH-621.4.007.046-4, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 79 du 21.04.2011, Publ. 6133400). [complément à l'inscription relative à l'adaptation des statuts au nouveau droit] [biffé: Capital social entièrement libéré].Statuts adaptés au nouveau droit.
Publication number: 6133400, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Prevo-conseils Sàrl, à Riddes, CH-621.4.007.046-4, société à responsabilité limitée (No. FOSC 16 du 25.01.2010, p. 26, Publ. 5458192).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
AXA Winterthur Agence partenaire Vincent Borgeat SA, à Sion (CH-626.3.002.533-1), associée, pour 190 parts sociales de CHF 100.00;
Borgeat née Roduit, Valérie, de Saillon et Vernayaz, à Riddes, associée, sans droit de signature, pour 10 parts sociales de CHF 100.00.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Theler, Roger, de Sierre, à Sierre, associé et gérant, avec signature individuelle, pour 200 parts sociales de CHF 100.00 [précédemment: gérant avec signature individuelle, sans part sociale].
Publication number: 5458192, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Prevo-conseils Sàrl, à Riddes, CH-621.4.007.046-4, société à responsabilité limitée (FOSC no 130 du 09.07.2009, p. 34, publ. 5127840).
Personne et signature radiée:
Borgeat, Vincent, de Vernayaz, à Riddes, gérant, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne:
Theler, Roger, de Sierre, à Sierre, gérant, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.