Reports for Pratique Vétérinaire Valesia SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pratique Vétérinaire Valesia SA
- Pratique Vétérinaire Valesia SA has its legal headquarters in Riddes and is active. It operates in the sector «Veterinary medicine».
- The company was founded on 09.09.2013.
- On the 05.09.2019 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-161.927.895.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.09.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Riddes
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.015.163-8
UID/VAT
CHE-161.927.895
Sector
Veterinary medicine
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Création et exploitation d'une pratique vétérinaire (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pratique Vétérinaire Valesia SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004710331, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Pratique Vétérinaire Valesia SA, à Riddes, CHE-161.927.895, société anonyme (No. FOSC 79 du 25.04.2016, Publ. 2798297).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Balet, Lionel, de Saint-Léonard, à Sion, président, avec signature collective à trois.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Fournier, Lucien, de Veysonnaz, à Sion, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature collective à trois];
Saillen, Caroline, de Dorénaz, à Fully, administratrice, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administratrice, secrétaire, avec signature collective à trois];
Théodoloz, Vincent, de Grône, à Conthey, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: à Chamoson, administrateur, avec signature collective à trois].
Publication number: 2798297, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Pratique Vétérinaire Valesia SA, à Riddes, CHE-161.927.895, société anonyme (No. FOSC 155 du 14.08.2014, Publ. 1662879).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue du Canal 16, 1908 Riddes.
Publication number: 1662879, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Pratique Vétérinaire Valesia SA, précédemment à Saint-Léonard, CHE-161.927.895, société anonyme (No. FOSC 176 du 12.09.2013, Publ. 1073891).
Statuts originaires:
22.08.2013.
Modification des statuts:
28.07.2014.
Nouveau siège:
Riddes.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route Cantonale 22, 1908 Riddes.
Nouveau capital-actions:
CHF 131'600.00 [précédemment: CHF 100'000.00].
Nouveau capital-actions libéré:
CHF 131'600.00 [précédemment: CHF 100'000.00].
Nouvelles actions:
1'316 actions nominatives de CHF 100.00 avec restriction de transmissibilité selon statuts. [précédemment: 1'000 actions nominatives à CHF 100.00 liées selon statuts]. Augmentation ordinaire du capital-actions.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Balet, Lionel, de Saint-Léonard, à Sion, président, avec signature collective à trois [précédemment: président avec signature collective à deux];
Fournier, Lucien, de Veysonnaz, à Sion, administrateur, avec signature collective à trois [précédemment: administrateur et secrétaire avec signature collective à deux];
Théodoloz, Vincent, de Grône, à St-Pierre-de-Clages (Chamoson), administrateur, avec signature collective à trois;
Saillen, Caroline, de Dorénaz, à Fully, administratrice et secrétaire, avec signature collective à trois.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.