Reports for Port Vidoli SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Port Vidoli SA
- Port Vidoli SA has its legal headquarters in Crans VD and is active. It operates in the sector «Repair and installation of machines and equipment».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 27.11.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company Port Vidoli SA is registered under the UID CHE-109.672.991.
Management (4)
newest board members
Romain Cazenave,
Pierre-Yves Jorand,
Tomás García González,
Frédéric Yves Boder
newest authorized signatories
Romain Cazenave,
Pierre-Yves Jorand,
Tomás García González,
Frédéric Yves Boder
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.07.2002
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Crans (VD)
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.030.556-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.672.991
Sector
Repair and installation of machines and equipment
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation du Port Vidoli et du chantier naval y rattaché.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidugère partenaires SA | Echallens | 30.01.2009 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidexpert SA Lausanne | Lausanne | <2004 | 24.11.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Port Vidoli SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005894809, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Port Vidoli SA, à Crans (VD), CHE-109.672.991 (FOSC du 18.10.2023, p. 0/1005863816). Cazenave Romain, de France, à Genève, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005863816, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Port Vidoli SA, à Crans (VD), CHE-109.672.991 (FOSC du 12.06.2023, p. 0/1005766690). Gilliéron Pascal n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005766690, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Port Vidoli SA, à Crans (VD), CHE-109.672.991 (FOSC du 22.11.2022, p. 0/1005610305). Lafargue Grégoire n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Jorand Pierre-Yves, qui est maintenant à Sant Vicenç de Montalt (Espagne), est nommé président. Gilliéron Pascal est maintenant à Chêne-Bougeries. García González Tomás, de Espagne, à Bassins, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.