Reports for Pondis Immo AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Pondis Immo AG
- Pondis Immo AG with its legal headquarters in Rorschach is active. Pondis Immo AG operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties».
- The management of the company Pondis Immo AG consists of 3 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 31.03.2010.
- In the commercial register the company Pondis Immo AG is registered under the UID CHE-110.194.018.
- Companies with an identical address: Bauunterstützung, Schwarz und Partner, GmbH, DST13 GmbH, ElleEsse Boxing GmbH.
Management (3)
newest board members
Peter Kreier,
Rosmarie Geissbühler-Gränicher,
Martin Josef Kreier
newest authorized signatories
Peter Kreier,
Rosmarie Geissbühler-Gränicher,
Martin Josef Kreier
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.08.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rorschach
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.053.929-8
UID/VAT
CHE-110.194.018
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Kauf, Verkauf und Verwaltung von Immobilien aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Pondis Immo AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5567148, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Pondis Immo AG, in Rorschach, CH-320.3.053.929-8, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 213 vom 02.11.2007, S. 10, Publ. 4181922).
Statutenänderung:
24.03.2010. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 24.03.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Trewitax St. Gallen AG, in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kreier, Peter, von Bichelsee-Balterswil und Tobel-Tägerschen, in Schwerzenbach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Uster].
Publication number: 4181922, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Pondis Immo AG, in Rorschach, CH-320.3.053.929-8, Kauf, Verkauf und Verwaltung von Immobilien aller Art, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 02.09.2003, S. 10, Publ. 1153492).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Morf, Matthias, von St. Gallen, in Arbon, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Geissbühler, Rosmarie, von Lauperswil, in Rorschacherberg, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Kreier, Peter, von Bichelsee-Balterswil und Tobel-Tägerschen, in Uster, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1153492, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Pondis Immo AG, in Rorschach, Pestalozzistrasse 11, 9400 Rorschach, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
25.08.2003.
Zweck:
Kauf, Verkauf und Verwaltung von Immobilien aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 250'000.--.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 250'000.--.
Aktien:
250 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.--.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch eingeschriebenen Brief.
Eingetragene Personen:
Kreier, Martin, von Bichelsee-Balterswil und Tobel-Tägerschen, in Rorschacherberg, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Morf, Matthias, von St. Gallen, in Arbon, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Trewitax St. Gallen AG, in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.