Reports for Polysoude (Schweiz) AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Polysoude (Schweiz) AG
- Polysoude (Schweiz) AG has its legal headquarters in Dällikon and is active. It operates in the sector «Trading with machines».
- The management of the company Polysoude (Schweiz) AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 29.11.2006.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 21.03.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-113.290.569.
- Moto- und Oldtimer-Center Katzensee GmbH, Motor Vintage Nicola Forestieri have the same address as Polysoude (Schweiz) AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.11.2006
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dällikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.030.415-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.290.569
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Erbringung von Leistungen im Bereich der Herstellung, Vertrieb und Wartung von Anlagen, insbesondere von Orbitalschweissanlagen, Anlagen für das mechanisierte Schweissen sowie Sonderlösungen zum automatisierten Schweissen nebst zugehörigen Dienstleistungen sowie artverwandter Gerätetechnik. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Panarex Revisions + Treuhand AG | Kloten | 05.12.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Polysoude (Suisse SA)
- Polysoude (Switzerland Inc)
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Polysoude (Schweiz) AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005990962, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Polysoude (Schweiz) AG, in Dällikon, CHE-113.290.569, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 9 vom 13.01.2022, Publ. 1005379806).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Matter, Daniel, von Engelberg, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005379806, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Polysoude (Schweiz) AG, in Dällikon, CHE-113.290.569, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 17.09.2014, S.0, Publ. 1718849).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mariner, Peter, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Nantes (FR), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Michel, Heinz, von Kriens, in Weiningen (ZH), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Weber, Pascal, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Nantes (FR), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 1718849, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Polysoude (Schweiz) AG, in Dällikon, CHE-113.290.569, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 59 vom 25.03.2010, S. 25, Publ. 5558526).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Czerny, Matthias, von Walchwil, in Frauenfeld, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Matter, Daniel, von Engelberg, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelprokura];
Panarex Revisions + Treuhand AG (CHE-103.756.767), in Kloten, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Panarex Revisions + Treuhand AG (CH-020.3.919.666-9)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.