Reports for Polymer Aktiengesellschaft
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Polymer Aktiengesellschaft
- Polymer Aktiengesellschaft has its legal headquarters in Obergerlafingen, is active and operates in the sector «Production and processing of non-ferrous metals».
- The company was founded on 02.10.1946.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 26.08.2016. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company Polymer Aktiengesellschaft is registered under the UID CHE-103.303.213.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.10.1946
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Obergerlafingen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-251.3.000.194-9
UID/VAT
CHE-103.303.213
Sector
Production and processing of non-ferrous metals
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrikation und Verkauf von Metallwaren, Packungen und Maschinen. Kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Effida Treuhand und Revisionen AG | Mellingen | <2004 | 22.08.2013 |
Other company names
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Polymer Aktiengesellschaft
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3023123, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Polymer Aktiengesellschaft, in Obergerlafingen, CHE-103.303.213, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2013, Publ. 1040987).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brügger, Fredy, von Adelboden, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1040987, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Polymer Aktiengesellschaft, in Obergerlafingen, CH-251.3.000.194-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 13.11.2012, Publ. 6928710).
Statutenänderung:
19.08.2013.
Zweck neu:
Fabrikation und Verkauf von Metallwaren, Packungen und Maschinen. Kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft sind den im Aktienbuch eingetragenen Aktionären schriftlich zuzustellen.
Vinkulierung neu:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Mit Erklärung vom 19.08.2013 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Effida Treuhand und Revisionen, in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 6928710, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Polymer Aktiengesellschaft, in Obergerlafingen, CH-251.3.000.194-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 11.07.1994, S. 3865).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wirth, Hermann O., von Ursenbach, in Muri bei Bern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wirth Schnöller, Liselotte, von Ursenbach, in Cotterd (Vully-les-Lacs), Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Wirth, Hermann Urs, von Ursenbach, in Spiez, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Brügger, Fredy, von Adelboden, in Thun, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.