Reports for Polaris 3 SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Polaris 3 SA
- Polaris 3 SA has its legal headquarters in Porrentruy, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- There are 3 active persons registered in the management.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 03.07.2013, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-114.963.997.
Management (3)
newest board members
Vincent Erwin Joseph Seuret,
Frédéric Robert Léon Balmer,
Luis Francisco Bartolome Fontecha
newest authorized signatories
Vincent Erwin Joseph Seuret,
Frédéric Robert Léon Balmer,
Luis Francisco Bartolome Fontecha
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.07.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Porrentruy
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.3.004.988-7
UID/VAT
CHE-114.963.997
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un bureau d'ingénieurs conseils actifs dans les systèmes d'information du territoire (SIT) liés aux domaines des travaux publics et ses réseaux d'infrastructures publiques et privées, des constructions et de l'aménagement du territoire en général, du management environnemental (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Simon Kohler S.A. | Courgenay | 20.07.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Polaris 3 SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 954715, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Polaris 3 SA, à Porrentruy, CH-670.3.004.988-7, société anonyme (No. FOSC 170 du 02.09.2011, p. 0, Publ. 6319084).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Buchs, Patrice, de Jaun, à Porrentruy, membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Seuret, Vincent Erwin Joseph, de Courrendlin, à Bassecourt (Haute-Sorne), membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 6319084, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Polaris 3 SA, à Porrentruy, CH-670.3.004.988-7, société anonyme (No. FOSC 137 du 20.07.2009, p. 12, Publ. 5147650).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Beuchat, Serge, de Soulce, à Fontenais, membre et secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Buchs, Patrice, de Jaun, à Porrentruy, membre, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: président avec signature collective à deux];
Bartolomé, Luis, de Espagne , à Delémont, membre, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: de d'Espagne, vice-président avec signature collective à deux];
Balmer, Frédéric, de Mühleberg, à Fontenais, membre, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 5147650, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
Polaris 3 SA, à Porrentruy, CH-670.3.004.988-7, La Rochette 9, 2900 Porrentruy, nouvelle société anonyme.
Date des statuts:
13.07.2009.
But:
Exploitation d'un bureau d'ingénieurs conseils actifs dans les systèmes d'information du territoire (SIT) liés aux domaines des travaux publics et ses réseaux d'infrastructures publiques et privées, des constructions et de l'aménagement du territoire en général, du management environnemental (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Capital-actions:
CHF 240'000.--, entièrement libéré.
Actions:
240 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000.--.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par lettre, télécopie ou courriel.
Restriction à la transmissibilité des actions nominatives:
selon statuts.
Personnes inscrites:
Buchs, Patrice, de Jaun, à Porrentruy, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Bartolomé, Luis, d'Espagne, à Delémont, vice-président, avec signature collective à deux;
Beuchat, Serge, de Soulce, à Fontenais, membre et secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux;
Fiduciaire Simon Kohler S.A., à Courgenay (CH-677.3.000.170-6), organe de révision.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.