Address
c/o Advokaturbüro Müllerhof
St. Niklausstrasse 1
4500 Solothurn
Reports for PLS Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PLS Holding AG
- PLS Holding AG is currently active and the industry «Operation of other financial institutions». The legal headquarters are in Solothurn.
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 18.09.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register SO under the UID CHE-101.635.578.
- Bärbel Reinold Praxis für Ernährungsberatung, Fosfantis AG, Hugo und Melanie Frey Stiftung are registered at the same address.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.09.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Solothurn
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-260.3.000.351-3
UID/VAT
CHE-101.635.578
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Aufbau von und Beteiligung an Unternehmen, Erschaffung und Vermarktung von immateriellen Werten und Gütern (Werbe-, Namens- und Markenrechte) sowie Erzeugung und Verwertung von hochwertigen Sachgütern, die zur Vermögensanlage geeignet sind. Kann für eigene oder fremde Rechnung dazu geeignete Projekte vorbereiten, ausführen und finanzieren, sich daran beteiligen sowie Lizenzen erwerben und vergeben. Bezweckt Aufbau, Einsatz und Bewirtschaftung von Sportrechten sowie Aufbau, Einsatz und Bewirtschaftung von Turnierpferden im Pferdeleistungsport (PLS). Kann Liegenschaften, Sachanlagen und Wertschriften erwerben, bewirtschaften und veräussern.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Presida Treuhand AG Aarau | Aarau | <2004 | 01.07.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PLS Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005840028, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
PLS Holding AG, in Solothurn, CHE-101.635.578, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 24.02.2021, Publ. 1005108837).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stampfli, Alexandra, von Büren (SO), in Braine-L'Alleud (BE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stampfli, Emilie, von Büren (SO), in Braine-L'Alleud (BE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005108837, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
PLS Holding AG, in Solothurn, CHE-101.635.578, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2014, S.0, Publ. 1588151).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stampfli, Alexandra, von Büren (SO), in Braine-L'Alleud (BE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Solothurn];
Kohler, Isabel, von Seehof, in Mümliswil-Ramiswil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Stampfli, Victor, von Büren (SO), in Solothurn, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1588151, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
PLS Holding AG, in Solothurn, CHE-101.635.578, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 19 vom 29.01.2014, Publ. 1313121). Mit Erklärung vom 23.06.2014 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Presida Treuhand AG Aarau, in Aarau, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.