Reports for PlanFabrik GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout PlanFabrik GmbH
- PlanFabrik GmbH has its legal headquarters in Oensingen, is active and operates in the sector «Architectural and engineering activities».
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 14.05.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- PlanFabrik GmbH is registered in the Canton of SO under the UID CHE-259.096.311.
- There are 21 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Ackermann Beteiligungen AG, Ackermann Immo AG, Airzone GmbH.
Management (4)
Executive board
Patrick Stalder,
Lilia Stalder,
Oliver Stalder,
Walter Daniel Stalder
newest authorized signatories
Patrick Stalder,
Lilia Stalder,
Oliver Stalder,
Walter Daniel Stalder
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.10.2013
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Oensingen
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.4.012.226-5
UID/VAT
CHE-259.096.311
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zeichnung von technischen Planwerken unabhängig von einer bestimmten Branche sowie Handel mit Waren aller Art. Kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: PlanFabrik GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006031487, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
PlanFabrik GmbH, in Oensingen, CHE-259.096.311, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 21.09.2022, Publ. 1005566068).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stalder, Lilia, von Rüegsau, in Niederbipp, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 6 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: russische Staatsangehörige].
Publication number: HR02-1005566068, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
PlanFabrik GmbH, in Oensingen, CHE-259.096.311, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 16.12.2014, S.0, Publ. 1882157).
Domizil neu:
Nordringstrasse 9, 4702 Oensingen.
Publication number: 1882157, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
PlanFabrik GmbH, in Oensingen, CHE-259.096.311, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 211 vom 31.10.2013, Publ. 1155553).
Domizil neu:
Dünnernstrasse 20, 4702 Oensingen.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Born, Hanspeter, von Niederbipp, in Niederbipp, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stalder, Patrick, von Rüegsau, in Niederbipp, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 6 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Stalder, Lilia, russische Staatsangehörige, in Niederbipp, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 6 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Stalder, Oliver, von Rüegsau, in Niederbipp, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 6 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit 5 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00];
Stalder, Walter, von Rüegsau, in Niederbipp, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit 3 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 1'000.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.